EP1613438 - ATOMIZER WICKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S. C. Johnson & Son, Inc. 1525 Howe Street Racine, WI 53403 / US | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTENS, Edward, J., III 6221 Berkshire Lane Racine, WI 53406 / US | 02 /
WALTER, Scott, D. 118 Walnut Road Twin Lakes, WI 53181 / US | 03 /
HELF, Thomas, A. 12780 W. Weatherstone Court New Berlin, WI 53151 / US | 04 /
TOMKINS, David, A. 77 Eldorado Drive Racine, WI 53402 / US | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/02] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al c/o Ruschke Hartmann & Kollegen Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04750087.1 | 14.04.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004US11436 | Priority number, date | US20030412911 | 14.04.2003 Original published format: US 412911 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004091804 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1613438 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1613438 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B05B17/06 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
B05B17/0646 (EP,US);
B05B17/06 (KR);
B05B17/0684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOCHTWIRKENDES SYSTEM EINES ZERSTÄUBERS | [2006/02] | English: | ATOMIZER WICKING SYSTEM | [2006/02] | French: | SYSTEME D'ATOMISEUR A MECHE | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06022964.8 / EP1743708 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2008 | BE | 20.08.2008 | CY | 20.08.2008 | CZ | 20.08.2008 | DK | 20.08.2008 | EE | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | NL | 20.08.2008 | PL | 20.08.2008 | RO | 20.08.2008 | SI | 20.08.2008 | SK | 20.08.2008 | TR | 20.08.2008 | BG | 20.11.2008 | SE | 20.11.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | HU | 21.02.2009 | IE | 14.04.2009 | LU | 14.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
HU | 21.02.2009 | ||
IE | 14.04.2009 | ||
LU | 14.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.04.2009 | ||
LU | 14.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 20.08.2008 | |
NL | 20.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB845639 (ALEXANDER LEENDERT THOMEE) [A] 18,25* claim 5 *; | [XI]EP0897755 (FUMAKILLA LTD [JP]) [X] 26,28-30 * paragraph [0041]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0057] * [I] 27; | [XA]US2001042794 (TOMKINS DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9,10,17-19,24 * paragraph [0028]; figures 2,3 * [A] 25,2,6-8,11-16,20-23,31-34; | [PX]WO03068412 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1,3-5,8,10,12,15,16,18,20,25 * page 11, line 20 - line 23; figure 14; claim 12 * | by applicant | US4301093 | US4334531 | US4582654 | US4753579 | US4790479 | US5529055 | EP0897755 | US6085740 | US6450419 | US6467476 |