EP1622693 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING HIGH PURITY ELUANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Change - representative | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dionex Corporation 1228 Titan Way Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Dionex Corporation 1228 Titan Way Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | ||
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states Alltech Associates, Inc. 2051 Waukegan Road Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, James, M., Jr. 1503 N. Beverly Lane Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | 02 /
SAARI-NORDHAUS, Raaidah 709 Birch Hollow Drive Antioch, IL 60002 / US | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Chung, Hsu Min Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [2012/43] |
Former [2010/44] | Chung, Hsu Min Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2006/06] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04750300.8 | 16.04.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004US11960 | Priority number, date | US20030421608 | 23.04.2003 Original published format: US 421608 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004094030 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1622693 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/36 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
G01N30/96 (EP,KR,US);
B01D15/36 (KR);
B01D15/16 (EP,US);
B01D15/367 (EP,US);
G01N30/34 (EP,US);
G01N30/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
G01N30/02, B01D15/361 (EP,US);
G01N30/34, G01N30/44 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES HOCHREINEN ELUIERUNGSMITTELS | [2006/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING HIGH PURITY ELUANT | [2006/06] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE GENERER UN ELUANT D'UNE PURETE ELEVEE | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 15.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXA]US5759405 (ANDERSON JR JAMES M [US], et al) [DX] 1,5,9,10 * column 22, line 45 - column 23, line 27 * * column 19, line 36 - line 38 * * column 18, line 29 - line 31 * * column 3, line 36 - line 37 * * column 24, line 47 - line 55 *[A] 2-4,6-8; | [DXA]US6036921 (SMALL HAMISH [US], et al) [DX] 1,5,9,10 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 10 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 5 * [A] 2-4,6-8 |