EP1617759 - INTRA-ORAL IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D4D Technologies, LLC 650 International Parkway, Suite 150 Richardson, TX 75081 / US | [2009/11] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states D3D L.P. 1161 Executive West Richardson, TX 75081-2230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUADLING, Henley 5424 Goodwin Avenue Dallas, Texas 75206 / US | 02 /
QUADLING, Mark 4556 St. James Dr. Plano, TX 75024 / US | 03 /
BLAIR, Alan 1980 Juliet Avenue St. Paul, MN 55105 / US | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/04] | 01 /
QUADLING, Henley 17200 Westgrove Dr., Apt. 2323 Addison, TX 75001 / US | ||
02 /
QUADLING, Mark 4556 St. James Dr. Plano, TX 75024 / US | |||
03 /
BLAIR, Alan 1980 Juliet Avenue St. Paul, MN 55105 / US | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04751156.3 | 30.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004US13632 | Priority number, date | US20030466549P | 30.04.2003 Original published format: US 466549 P | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004100067 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1617759 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
A61B1/00048 (EP,US);
A61B1/24 (EP,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0187 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAORALES BILDGEBENDES SYSTEM | [2006/04] | English: | INTRA-ORAL IMAGING SYSTEM | [2006/04] | French: | SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE INTRA-ORAL | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 16.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001041838 (HOLUPKA EDWARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0035] , [0048] - [0053] *; | [X]WO0200115 (DENTAL MAPPING SYSTEMS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 22, lines 9-24 ** claim - *; | [XY]WO0206767 (GENEX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 5 - page 7, line 12 * [Y] 8-10; | [X]US6416476 (OGASAWARA YOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 5, line 9 - column 9, line 4 *; | [XY]US6503195 (KELLER KURTIS P [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-14 * column 18, line 7 - column 20, line 63 * * figure 8 * * claim - * [Y] 8-10 | International search | [X]US6503195 (KELLER KURTIS P [US], et al) |