EP1629160 - A STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PREFABRICATED CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Powell, David W. 8108 Texas Plume Road Austin, TX 78759 / US | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04751254.6 | 03.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004US13775 | Priority number, date | US20030467410P | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 467410 P | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004099515 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629160 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/21, E04C2/52, E04B1/32, E04C3/34 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
E04C3/34 (EP,US);
E04B1/20 (EP,US);
E04B1/21 (EP,US);
E04B1/34823 (EP,US);
E04B5/43 (EP,US);
E04B5/48 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN FERTIGBAU | [2006/09] | English: | A STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PREFABRICATED CONSTRUCTION | [2006/09] | French: | STRUCTURE ET PROCEDE DE CONSTRUCTION PREFABRIQUEE | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 13.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/40] | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB115457 (HEATHCOTE CHARLES HENRY, et al) [X] 1-5,8,10,11,15,16,18,20,22,33-36,39-43,47,51,53-55,59-62 * figures 1,6,7 * [Y] 6,37,38,44,46,50,52,58,63,64,67,68; | [Y]FR992152 (SPAZZINI, ANGELO) [Y] 6 * figure 2 *; | [A]FR631028 (DARNAULT, RENE-MARCEL) [A] 7 * page 1, columns 35-45; figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0013570 (MARSTETTEN MARBETON [DE]) [Y] 67,68 * figures 1-3 * [A] 23; | [Y]BE510326 (BLATON,A ; BLATON,E) [Y] 37 * figure 7 *; | [Y]US4378664 (ANDAYA ANTONIO P [PH]) [Y] 38,52,58 * figure 3 *; | [Y]GB1211716 (DYNA STRUCTURES [US], et al) [Y] 44,46,63,64 * figures 10,6,20 *; | [YA]US4422269 (GIARD ROBERT L [US]) [Y] 50 * column 3, lines 1-5; figure 3 * [A] 26 |