EP1634235 - UNIVERSAL WORKLIST SERVICE AND USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states SAP AG Neurottstrasse 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUSE, Matthias 1429 Page Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 02 /
JORDT, Nicolai Friedrichstr. 86 a 76669 Bad Schönborn / DE | 03 /
WODTKE, Dirk 212 Valencia Avenue Aptos, CA 95003 / US | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/11] | 01 /
KRUSE, Matthias 1429 Page Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | ||
02 /
JORDT, Nicolai Ahornweg 4 D-74918 Angelbachtal / DE | |||
03 /
WODTKE, Dirk 212 Valencia Avenue Aptos, CA 95003 / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04751561.4 | 07.05.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004US14219 | Priority number, date | US20030478514P | 13.06.2003 Original published format: US 478514 P | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005004025 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1634235 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06311 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06316 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RECHNERPROGRAMM ZUM ERSTELLEN VON UNIVERSELLEN AUFGABENLISTEN UND BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE DAZU | [2006/11] | English: | UNIVERSAL WORKLIST SERVICE AND USER INTERFACE | [2006/11] | French: | SERVICE LISTE DE TRAVAUX UNIVERSEL ET INTERFACE UTILISATEUR | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 15.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/18] | 23.12.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5077666 (BRIMM JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 2,5,7 * * column 1, lines 30-37 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 7 * * column 9, lines 32-38 * * column 11, lines 33-44 *; | [X]US6117079 (BRACKETT CHARLES C [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 2, lines 8-43 * * column 4, lines 52-65 * * column 12, line 66 - column 13, line 36 *; | [A]US6287257 (MATICHUK CHRIS E [US]) [A] 2,11 * abstract * * column 3, lines 16-54 * * column 4, lines 10-25 ** column 6, lines 18-35 *; | [A] - DAHALIN Z M ET AL, Workflow interoperability using extensible markup language (XML), PAGE(S) 513-516, (20020716), XP010603584 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 514, column L, paragraphs 8-12 * |