EP1631256 - DISSOLVABLE BACKING LAYER FOR USE WITH A TRANSMUCOSAL DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEPHALON, INC. 41 Moores Road, P.O.Box 4011 Frazer, PA 19355 / US | [2006/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hao 538 East Woodpine Circle Midvale, UT 84047 / US | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/10] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04751777.6 | 10.05.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004US14550 | Priority number, date | US20030469507P | 09.05.2003 Original published format: US 469507 P | US20040841893 | 07.05.2004 Original published format: US 841893 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004100925 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1631256 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/70 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K9/7007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/10] | A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | 08.12.2005 | HR | 08.12.2005 | LT | 08.12.2005 | LV | 08.12.2005 | MK | 08.12.2005 | Title | German: | LÖSLICHE RÜCKSCHICHT ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINER TRANSMUKOSALEN ABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2006/10] | English: | DISSOLVABLE BACKING LAYER FOR USE WITH A TRANSMUCOSAL DELIVERY DEVICE | [2006/10] | French: | COUCHE DE SUPPORT SOLUBLE UTILISABLE AVEC UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE TRANSMUQUEUSE | [2006/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/23] | 02.05.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2011 | 17.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4307075 (MARTIN FREDERICK H) [X] 1-5,11,13,14,17-34,42,43,47-55,58-60 * column 3, line 18 - line 41 *; | [X]US5529782 (STAAB ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-12,17,21-34 * column 7 - column 8; example 15 *; | [X]US5700478 (BIEGAJSKI JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-19,22-34,42,43,46-55,59,60 * figure 4 * * column 4, line 21 - line 46 * * column 7, line 48 - line 58 * * column 17, line 45 - column 18, line 6 *; | [X]EP0873750 (PERMATEC PHARMA AG [CH]) [X] 1-11,15,17,21-34 * column 7 - column 8; example 1 *; | [X]WO9955312 (VIROTEX CORP [US]) [X] 1-9,11,15-34,42-60 * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 2 * * figure 2 * * page 6, line 24 - line 27 * * page 9, line 1 - line 25 * * page 12, line 5 - page 15, line 17 * * page 18, line 18 - line 20; example - *; | [X]US2001006677 (MCGINITY JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15-17,21-34,42,43* column 11 - column 12; example 3 *; | [X]WO0202085 (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE], et al) [X] 1-12,17,21-34 * page 14; example 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X]US6375963 (REPKA MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-9,14,17-19,21-24,42,43,46,49-55,59,60 * column 8, line 34 - line 33 * * example 12 *; | [X]US2002068151 (KIM WON K [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,11,12,17,21-34 * column 6; examples 2-5 *; | [X]WO03015748 (ACCESS PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13,14,17-34 * page 18, paragraph 15 - page 19 * |