EP1626696 - NOVEL FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curagen Corporation 555 Long Wharf Drive New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [2006/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERSON, Jeffrey 11 Broadview Drive Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | 02 /
SCIORE, Paul 4213 Avalon Haven Drive North Haven, CT 06473 / US | 03 /
MEZES, Peter 7 Clark's Lane Old Lyme, CT 06371 / US | 04 /
LICHENSTEIN, Henri 88 Greenbrier Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 05 /
JEFFERS, Michael 14 Flax Mill Hollow Branford, CT 06405 / US | 06 /
LAROCHELLE, William 15 Devonshire Lane Madison, CT 06443 / US | 07 /
RUIZ-MARTINEZ, Marie 17 Sabrina Drive Bethany, CT 06524 / US | 08 /
CHERNAYA, Galina 25 Paper Mill Drive Madison, CT 06443 / US | [2008/23] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
PETERSON, Jeffrey 74 Horshoe Road Guilford, CT 06437 / US | ||
02 /
SCIORE, Paul 4213 Avalon Haven Drive North Haven, CT 06473 / US | |||
03 /
MEZES, Peter 7 Clark's Lane Old Lyme, CT 06371 / US | |||
04 /
LICHTENSTEIN, Henri 88 Greenbrier Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | |||
05 /
JEFFERS, Michael 14 Flax Mill Hollow Branford, CT 06405 / US | |||
06 /
LAROCHELLE, William 15 Devonshire Lane Madison, CT 06443 / US | |||
07 /
RUIZ-MARTINEZ, Marie 17 Sabrina Drive Bethany, CT 06424 / US | |||
08 /
CHERNAYA, Galina 25 Paper Mill Drive Madison, CT 06443 / US | |||
Former [2006/08] | 01 /
PETERSON, Jeffrey 11 Broadview Drive Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | ||
02 /
SCIORE, Paul 4213 Avalon Haven Drive North Haven, CT 06473 / US | |||
03 /
MEZES, Peter 7 Clark's Lane Old Lyme, CT 06371 / US | |||
04 /
LICHTENSTEIN, Henri 88 Greenbrier Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | |||
05 /
JEFFERS, Michael 14 Flax Mill Hollow Branford, CT 06405 / US | |||
06 /
LAROCHELLE, William 15 Devonshire Lane Madison, CT 06443 / US | |||
07 /
RUIZ-MARTINEZ, Marie 17 Sabrina Drive Bethany, CT 06424 / US | |||
08 /
CHERNAYA, Galina 25 Paper Mill Drive Madison, CT 06443 / US | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2006/08] | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04751821.2 | 10.05.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004US14623 | Priority number, date | US20030469353P | 09.05.2003 Original published format: US 469353 P | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004100892 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1626696 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, C07K14/50 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
A61K38/1825 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/08] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE FIBROBLASTEN-WACHSTUMSFAKTOREN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2006/08] | English: | NOVEL FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2006/08] | French: | NOUVEAUX FACTEURS DE CROISSANCE DES FIBROBLASTES ET PROCEDES POUR LES UTILISER | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 02.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/31] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0202625 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US5011691 (OPPERMANN HERMANN [US], et al) |