EP1622816 - CHILD RESISTANT BLISTER PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Corporation One High Ridge Park Stamford CT 06905 / US | For all designated states Hession, Christopher 511 N. Boulevard 23 Richmond, Virginia 23220 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Corporation One High Ridge Park Stamford, CT 06905 / US | ||
For all designated states Hession, Christopher 511 N. Boulevard 23 Richmond, Virginia 23220 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSION, Christopher 511 N. Boulevard 23 Richmond, Virginia 23220 / US | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/06] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al HLBBshaw Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04752193.5 | 12.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004US15113 | Priority number, date | US20030469721P | 12.05.2003 Original published format: US 469721 P | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004101386 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1622816 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1622816 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/34 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
B65D75/327 (EP,US);
B65D2215/04 (EP,US);
B65D2575/3236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KINDERSICHERE BLISTERPACKUNG | [2006/06] | English: | CHILD RESISTANT BLISTER PACKAGE | [2006/06] | French: | EMBALLAGE-COQUE SUR POUR LES ENFANTS | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 18.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2006 | CY | 18.10.2006 | CZ | 18.10.2006 | EE | 18.10.2006 | FI | 18.10.2006 | PL | 18.10.2006 | RO | 18.10.2006 | SI | 18.10.2006 | SK | 18.10.2006 | TR | 18.10.2006 | BG | 18.01.2007 | GR | 19.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | HU | 19.04.2007 | LU | 12.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CY | 18.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2006 | ||
EE | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
HU | 19.04.2007 | ||
LU | 12.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CZ | 18.10.2006 | ||
EE | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CZ | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CZ | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CZ | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CZ | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/15] | SI | 18.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003006163 (PATTERSON DAVID HUGH [GB]) [A] 1,9,12 * paragraph [0030]; figure -; claim 3 *; | [PA]US2003213721 (JONES MARTY [US]) [PA] 1,9,12* figure - * |