EP1653886 - INTRAOCULAR LENS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAN, Son, Trung 4306 Vine Ridge Court Arlington, TX 76017 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Hanna, Peter William Derek Hanna, Moore & Curley 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 04753051.4 | 24.05.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004US16154 | Priority number, date | US20030618954 | 14.07.2003 Original published format: US 618954 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005013850 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1653886 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1653886 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
A61F2/1613 (EP,US);
A61F2/1648 (US);
A61F2002/169 (EP);
A61F2220/0033 (EP);
A61F2250/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAOKULARLINSEN-SYSTEM | [2006/19] | English: | INTRAOCULAR LENS SYSTEM | [2006/19] | French: | SYSTEME DE LENTILLES INTRAOCULAIRES | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 31.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0269198 (KELMAN CHARLES D) [Y] 1-5 * column 6, line 17 - line 52; figure 5 *; | [Y]FR2728458 (GUILBERT GUILLAUME BENJAMIN GE [FR]) [Y] 1,5 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 2 * * page 6, line 8 - line 12 *; | [Y]FR2734472 (IOLTECHNOLOGIE PRODUCTION [FR]) [Y] 1-5 * page 3, line 17 - line 26 * * page 4, line 20 - line 23 * * page 11, line 10 - line 15; figures 6,18 *; | [Y]US5814103 (LIPSHITZ ISAAC [IL], et al) [Y] 5* figure 1 *; | [Y]WO0137762 (ALLERGAN SALES INC [US], et al) [Y] 4 * page 6, line 7 - line 23 *; | [Y]EP1138282 (KELMAN CHARLES D M D [US]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2001034552 (YOUNG CRAIG [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017]; figures 3,10 * | International search | [Y]US4122556 (POLER STANLEY); | [Y]US4661108 (GRENDAHL DENNIS T [US], et al); | [Y]US2002173846 (BLAKE LARRY [US], et al); | [YP]US2003158560 (PORTNEY VALDEMAR [US]) | by applicant | US4575373 | US4919151 | US5026783 | US5222981 | US5358520 | US5571177 | US5628798 | US5800533 |