EP1627478 - POWER TILT COMPENSATION USING AUTOMATIC POWER BALANCE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/08] | POWER TILT COMPENSATION USING AUTOMATIC POWER BALANCE | ||
[2010/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2010/12] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Cechan 3948 Burnley Drive Plano, TX 75025 / US | 02 /
KINOSHITA, Susumu 6600 Preston Road Apt. 1126 Plano, TX 75024 / US | [2009/42] |
Former [2006/08] | 01 /
TIAN, Cechan 3948 Burnley Drive Plano, TX 75025 / US | ||
02 /
KINOSHITA, Susumu, 6600 Preston Road Apt. 1126 Plano, TX 75024 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/08] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04753212.2 | 25.05.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004US16341 | Priority number, date | US20030448634 | 29.05.2003 Original published format: US 448634 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004112287 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1627478 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627478 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/17 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
H04B10/2942 (EP,US);
H01S3/06758 (EP,US);
H01S3/1301 (EP,US);
H01S3/13013 (EP,US);
H01S3/10015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2010/09] |
Former [2006/36] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPENSATION VON LEISTUNGSANSTIEGEN MIT AUTOMATISCHER BALANCELEISTUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2009/42] | English: | POWER TILT COMPENSATION USING AUTOMATIC POWER BALANCE CONTROL | [2010/12] | French: | COMPENSATION DE L'INCLINAISON DE PUISSANCE AU MOYEN DU CONTRÔLE DE L'EQUILIBRE DE PUISSANCE AUTOMATIQUE | [2009/41] |
Former [2006/08] | KOMPENSATION VON LEISTUNGANSTIEGEN MIT AUTOMATISCHER BALANCELEISTUNGSSTEURUNG | ||
Former [2006/08] | POWER TILT COMPENSATION USING AUTOMATIC POWER BALANCE | ||
Former [2006/08] | COMPENSATION DE L'INCLINAISON DE PUISSANCE AU MOYEN DU CONTROLE DE L'EQUILIBRE DE PUISSANCE AUTOMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 19.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1137129 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,7,8,15,16,20 * column 3, line 51 - column 6, line 55 * * figures 3,5-12 * [Y] 2-6,9-14,17-19; | [XA]US6219176 (TERAHARA TAKAFUMI [JP]) [X] 1,7,8,15,16,20 * column 12, line 7 - line 39 * * column 13, line 57 - column 14, line 45 * * figures 19,20,24,25 * [A] 2-6,9-14,17-19; | [XA]EP0762569 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7,8,15,16,20 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, line 10 - line 34 * * figures 1,6 * [A] 2-6,9-14,17-19; | [XA]WO0229942 (CIENA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,15,16,20 * page 19, line 3 - page 20, line 13 * * figure 10 * [A] 2-6,9-14,17-19; | [A]US6215584 (YANG DAN DAN [CA], et al) [A] 1,7,8,15,16,20,2-6,9-14,17-19 * column 8, line 64 - column 11, line 66 * * figures 3,4 * | [Y] - SUZUKI H ET AL, "DYNAMIC GAIN CONTROL BY MAXIMUM SIGNAL POWER CHANNEL IN OPTICAL LINEAR REPEATERS FOR WDM PHOTONIC TRANSPORT NETWORKS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19980501), vol. 10, no. 5, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 734 - 736, XP000754670 [Y] 2-6,9-14,17-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.669408 |