EP1628691 - DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR DISPENSING VOLATILE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTRING, Brice, Daniel 5674 Glen Oak Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/09] | 01 /
WESTRING, Brice, Daniel 1282 Sandtrap Court Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | Representative(s) | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2006/43] | Howard, Phillip Jan, et al Patent Department Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd. Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2006/16] | Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04753257.7 | 21.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004US16396 | Priority number, date | US20030447755 | 29.05.2003 Original published format: US 447755 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004105814 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1628691 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/03, A61L9/02, A01M1/20, A61L9/04, A61L9/12 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
A61L9/125 (EP,US);
A61L9/03 (KR);
A01M1/2033 (EP,US);
A01M1/2038 (EP,US);
A01M1/2072 (EP,US);
A01M1/2077 (EP,US);
A61L9/02 (EP,US);
A61L9/035 (EP,US);
A61L9/037 (EP,US);
A61L9/04 (EP,US);
A61L9/042 (EP,US);
A61L9/048 (EP,US);
A61L9/122 (EP,US);
A61L9/127 (EP,US);
A61L9/145 (EP,US);
B60H3/0007 (EP,US);
A61L2209/11 (KR);
A61L2209/13 (KR);
A61L2209/134 (KR);
A61L2209/135 (KR);
B60H2003/0042 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME ZUR ABGABE VON FLÜCHTIGEN MATERIALIEN | [2006/09] | English: | DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR DISPENSING VOLATILE MATERIALS | [2006/09] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTEMES DE DISTRIBUTION DE SUBSTANCES VOLATILES | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/31] | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US5805768 (SCHWARTZ GARY [US], et al) [XD] 1,5-11,16,19-24 * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0145]; figures 1-7,11 *; | [XA]US2002158351 (WOHRLE GREGORY D [US]) [X] 1,5-11 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-4; | [X]EP0836856 (NIKKO IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 2-4 * column 9, line 3 - line 21 * * column 9, line 31 - line 50; figures 9B,10 *; | [X]EP1304127 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 12-15 * paragraph [0050] *; | [X]WO0012143 (AROMA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1,19,20 * page 9, line 14 - page 15, line 21 *; | [PX]US2003164557 (CHUNG CALEB [US], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document *; | [DXA]US2002066798 (LAUDAMIEL-PELLET CHRISTOPHE [US], et al) [DX] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-24 |