EP1627448 - BACK-END VARIATION CONTROL CAP FOR USE WITH A JACK MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commscope Solutions Properties, LLC 1285 Southern Way Sparks, NV 89431 / US | [2006/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABEL, John, N. 1472 Laurel Oak Drive Avon, IN 46123 / US | 02 /
MOFFITT, Bryan, S. 17 South Lake Drive Red Bank, NJ 07701-5313 / US | 03 /
SPITZ, William, T. 9302 Timberline Drive Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US | 04 /
WILD, Ronald, L. 2401 Mesa Oak Trail Plano, TX 75025 / US | 05 /
MILLER, Timothy, C. 2604 Valley Creek Trail McKinney, Texas 75070 / US | [2007/02] |
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
ABEL, John, N. 1472 Laurel Oak Drive Avon, IN 46123 / US | ||
02 /
MOFFITT, Bryan, S. 17 South Lake Drive Red Bank, NJ 07701-5313 / US | |||
03 /
SPITZ, William, T. 9302 Timberline Drive Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US | |||
04 /
WILD, Ronald, L. 2401 Mesa Oak Trail Plano, TX 75025 / US | |||
05 /
BROWN, Scott 6714 Aintree Court Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | |||
06 /
MILLER, Timothy, C. 2604 Valley Creek Trail McKinney, Texas 75070 / US | |||
Former [2006/08] | 01 /
ABEL, John, N. 1472 Laurel Oak Drive Avon, IN 46123 / US | ||
02 /
MOFFITT, Bryan, S. 17 South Lake Drive Red Bank, NJ 07701-5313 / US | |||
03 /
SPITZ, William, T. 9302 Timberline Drive Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US | |||
04 /
WILD, Ronald, L. 2401 Mesa Oak Trail Plano, TX 75025 / US | |||
05 /
BROWN, Scott 6714 Aintree Court Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | |||
06 /
MILLER, Timothy, C. 5844 Shelby Street Indianapolis, IN 46227 / US | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/08] | Popp, Eugen, et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04753434.2 | 26.05.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004US16605 | Priority number, date | US20030447181 | 28.05.2003 Original published format: US 447181 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004107504 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1627448 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627448 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
H01R24/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPPE ZUR STEUERUNG DER RÜCKSEITENVARIATION ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINEM KLINKENSTECKERMODUL | [2006/08] | English: | BACK-END VARIATION CONTROL CAP FOR USE WITH A JACK MODULE | [2006/08] | French: | CAPUCHON DE COMMANDE DE VARIATION D'EXTREMITE ARRIERE POUR MODULE DE PRISE | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 27.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.09.2008 | BE | 03.09.2008 | CY | 03.09.2008 | CZ | 03.09.2008 | DK | 03.09.2008 | EE | 03.09.2008 | FI | 03.09.2008 | IT | 03.09.2008 | NL | 03.09.2008 | PL | 03.09.2008 | RO | 03.09.2008 | SI | 03.09.2008 | SK | 03.09.2008 | TR | 03.09.2008 | BG | 03.12.2008 | SE | 03.12.2008 | GR | 04.12.2008 | ES | 14.12.2008 | PT | 03.02.2009 | HU | 04.03.2009 | IE | 26.05.2009 | LU | 26.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
HU | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 26.05.2009 | ||
LU | 26.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
IE | 26.05.2009 | ||
LU | 26.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
IE | 26.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
IE | 26.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
IE | 26.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 03.09.2008 | |
ES | 14.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3772635 (FREY D, et al) [Y] 7,11 * column 8, line 44 - line 46 * * figure 4a *; | [YA]US6017229 (TULLEY BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,5,7 * figure 15 * * column 14, line 14 - line 16 * * column 14, line 14 - line 16 * [A] 19; | [XY]EP0982815 (PANDUIT CORP [US]) [X] 10 * column 5, line 36 - line 43 * * paragraph [0010]; figures 5,9-11 * [Y] 11; | [XY]US6267617 (NOZICK JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1,12 * column 5, line 28 - line 59 * * column 6, line 26 - line 32 * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 2-7,15-19; | [A]US6325671 (RADLIFF DAVID RAY [US]) [A] 8 * figure 10 *; | [Y]US6371780 (APONTE LUIS A [US], et al) [Y] 15-19 * column 4, line 1 - line 13 * * column 7, line 45 - line 47 ** figure 3 *; | [Y]US2002094715 (PEPE PAUL J [US], et al) [Y] 4,6 * paragraph [0029] * |