EP1628743 - METHOD FOR REMOVING MERCURY FROM FLUE GAS OF SOLID FUEL COMBUSTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/09] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING MERCURY FROM FLUE GAS OF SOLID FUEL COMBUSTION | ||
[2010/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRINIVASACHAR, Srivats 10 Podunk Road Sturbridge, MA 01566 / US | 02 /
KANG, Shin, G. 11 Trainor Drive Simsbury, CT 06089 / US | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Hellwig, Tillmann Johannes Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Hellwig, Tillmann Johannes Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 103762 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04754074.5 | 01.06.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004US17383 | Priority number, date | US20030453140 | 03.06.2003 Original published format: US 453140 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004108254 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1628743 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1628743 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/64, B01D53/10, B01J20/20, B01J20/30, B01J20/32 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
B01D53/83 (EP,US);
B01D53/10 (EP,US);
B01D53/64 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,US);
F23J15/003 (EP,US);
F23J15/006 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/602 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [2006/36] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON QUECKSILBER AUS RAUCHGAS VON FESTBRENNSTOFFVERBRENNUNG | [2010/51] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVING MERCURY FROM FLUE GAS OF SOLID FUEL COMBUSTION | [2010/51] | French: | PROCEDE POUR L'ELIMINATION DE MERCURE DANS LES GAZ DE COMBUSTION DE COMBUSTIBLES SOLIDES | [2010/51] |
Former [2006/09] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON QUECKSILBER AUS RAUCHGAS VON FESTBRENNSTOFFVERBRENNUNG | ||
Former [2006/09] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING MERCURY FROM FLUE GAS OF SOLID FUEL COMBUSTION | ||
Former [2006/09] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'ELIMINATION DE MERCURE DANS LES GAZ DE COMBUSTION DE COMBUSTIBLES SOLIDES | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09007497.2 / EP2111906 | EP10184020.5 / EP2295129 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2006 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0253563 (NIRO ATOMIZER AS [DK]) [X] 1-4,8-13,17-20 * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 8 * * page 15, line 1 - line 9; figures 1,2; claim - *; | [Y]US5854173 (CHANG RAMSAY [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 53 *; | [X]EP1275430 (MG TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * page 5, line 8 - line 41; figure 1; claim - *; | [Y]US6521021 (PENNLINE HENRY W [US], et al) [Y] 1-20* column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 24 * |