EP1633825 - NON-STICK POWDER COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAVERO, Jose 3431 North Natoma Avenue Chicago, IL 60634 / US | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2006/11] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department (AIP) P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 04754357.4 | 04.06.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004US17733 | Priority number, date | US20030476427P | 06.06.2003 Original published format: US 476427 P | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004108842 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633825 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633825 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D127/12, C09D127/18, C09D181/04, C09D181/06, C09D179/08, C09D171/00, B29B9/06 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
C09D5/032 (EP,US);
C09D127/12 (KR);
C09D127/18 (KR);
C09D171/00 (EP,US);
C09D179/08 (EP,KR,US);
C09D181/02 (EP,US);
C09D181/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2650/40 (EP,US);
C08G2650/48 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D171/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C09D179/08, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C09D181/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C09D181/06, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIHAFTPULVERBESCHICHTUNG | [2006/11] | English: | NON-STICK POWDER COATING | [2006/11] | French: | REVETEMENT EN POUDRE ANTI-ADHESIF | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 23.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.11.2008 | BE | 19.11.2008 | CY | 19.11.2008 | NL | 19.11.2008 | SI | 19.11.2008 | BG | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | ES | 01.03.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | LU | 04.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | FR | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
LU | 04.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 01.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0259290 (LABOFINA SA [BE]) [A] 1-16 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0456018 (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA [US]) [A] 1-16 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]US5691067 (PATEL RAJENDRA [US]) [DA] 1-16* example -; claim - *; | [A]US5726232 (EGAMI MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 13, lines 29-37; claim - *; | [A]US2001021679 (OHIRA KOUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0053] , [0058]; example -; claim - * |