EP1638446 - GLUCOSE MEASURING MODULE AND INSULIN PUMP COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Therasense, Inc. 1360 South Loop Road Alameda, CA 94502 / US | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODNOW, Timothy, T. 8280 Regency Drive Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | 02 /
BLOMQUIST, Michael, L. 144 14th Avenue NW Andover, MN 55304 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Jay, G. 6560 Fogelman Road Maple Plain, MN 55359 / US | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | ||
Former [2006/13] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04754727.8 | 04.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004US18204 | Priority number, date | US20030458914 | 10.06.2003 Original published format: US 458914 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004110256 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1638446 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1638446 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
G01N33/66 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | GLUCOSEMESSMODUL UND INSULINPUMPEN-KOMBINATION | [2006/13] | English: | GLUCOSE MEASURING MODULE AND INSULIN PUMP COMBINATION | [2006/13] | French: | ENSEMBLE COMBINANT UN MODULE DE MESURE DE GLUCOSE ET UNE POMPE A INSULINE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2004 | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | IT | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | PL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | IE | 04.06.2013 | LU | 04.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | FR | 22.07.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | ES | 02.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
TR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IE | 04.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 22.07.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
IE | 04.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 22.07.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
IE | 04.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 22.07.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
IE | 04.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003088238 (POULSEN JENS ULRIK [DK], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] * * figures 1a-4b * * paragraphs [0124] - [0126] ** claim 37 * | International search | [Y]US2002107476 (MANN ALFRED E [US], et al); | [Y]US2001025189 (HAUETER ULRICH [CH], et al); | [Y]US5376070 (PURVIS RICHARD E [US], et al); | [Y]US5665065 (COLMAN FREDRIC C [US], et al); | [AP]US2003207113 (COULTER KENT E [US], et al) | by applicant | US5376070 |