EP1639771 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DYNAMIC ADJUSTMENT OF RISE-OVER-THERMAL (ROT) THRESHOLD FOR REVERSE LINK RATE ALLOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Mingxi 3713 Caminito Carmel Landing San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
ESTEVES, Eduardo A S 14005H Mango Drive Del Mar, California 92014 / US | 03 /
ATTAR, Rashid, Ahmed 14724 Via Mantova San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 04 /
BHUSHAN, Naga 7794 Roan Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 05 /
BLACK, Peter J. 2961 First Avenue San Diego, CA 92103 / US | [2018/34] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
FAN, Mingxi 3713 Caminito Carmel Landing San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
02 /
ESTEVES, Eduardo, A.S. 14005H Mango Drive Del Mar, California 92014 / US | |||
03 /
ATTAR, Rashid, Ahmed 14724 Via Mantova San Diego, CA 92127 / US | |||
04 /
BHUSHAN, Naga 7794 Roan Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
05 /
BLACK, Peter J. 2961 First Avenue San Diego, CA 92103 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/13] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04755279.9 | 15.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004US19002 | Priority number, date | US20030600231 | 19.06.2003 Original published format: US 600231 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004114715 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1639771 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1639771 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, // H04W28/22 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04W28/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/13] | H04L12/56, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2006/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DYNAMISCHEN EINSTELLUNG DER ROT-SCHWELLE (RISE-OVER-THERMAL) FÜR DIE RÜCKWÄRTS-STRECKEN-RATENZUTEILUNG | [2018/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DYNAMIC ADJUSTMENT OF RISE-OVER-THERMAL (ROT) THRESHOLD FOR REVERSE LINK RATE ALLOCATION | [2006/13] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR REGLER DE MANIERE DYNAMIQUE UN SEUIL THERMIQUE MONTANT POUR UNE ATTRIBUTION DE DEBIT DE LIAISONS INVERSEE | [2006/13] |
Former [2006/13] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DYNAMSICHEN EINSTELLUNG DER ROT-SCHWELLE (RISE-OVER-THERMAL) FÜR DIE RÜCKWÄRTS-STRECKEN-RATENZUTEILUNG | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 24.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2004 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | PT | 22.12.2018 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 22.08.2018 | |
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | ES | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]JP2000307511 (NEC CORP) [I] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [I]US6317600 (SALONAHO OSCAR [FI], et al) [I] 1-34 * abstract * * columns 4-7 * * column 9, lines 1-11 *; | [PI]US6628924 (MIYAMOTO YUKIE [JP]) [PI] 1-34 * abstract * * columns 1-6 *; | [I] - ATTAR R A ET AL, "A reverse link outer-loop power control algorithm for cdma2000 1xEV systems", ICC 2002. 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. NEW YORK, NY, APRIL 28 - MAY 2, 2002, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020428), VOL. 1 OF 5, ISBN 0-7803-7400-2, pages 573 - 578, XP010589559 [I] 1-34 * pages 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2002.996918 | [A] - CHAKRAVARTY S ET AL, "An algorithm for reverse traffic channel rate control for cdma2000 high rate packet data systems", GLOBECOM'01. 2001 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. SAN ANTONIO, TX, NOV. 25 - 29, 2001, IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20011125), VOL. 6 OF 6, ISBN 0-7803-7206-9, pages 3733 - 3737, XP002277693 [A] 1-34 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2001.966378 | [PI] - FAN M ET AL, "The impact of antenna-array receivers on the reverse link performance of CDMA 2000 1xEV high rate packet data systems", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2003. VTC 2003-FALL. 2003 IEEE 58TH ORLANDO, FL, USA 6-9 OCT. 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20031006), ISBN 0-7803-7954-3, pages 841 - 846Vol2, XP010700909 [PI] 1-34 * pages 842,843 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2003.1285139 | Examination | EP1100283 | EP1126734 | US6317600 | - ESTEVES E, "On the reverse link capacity of CDMA2000 high rate packet data systems", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS - 28 APRIL-2 MAY 2002 - NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20020428), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/ICC.2002.997163, ISBN 978-0-7803-7400-3, pages 1823 - 1828, XP010589801 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2002.997163 |