EP1638748 - PROPANE DIOL-BASED POLYESTER RESIN AND SHRINK FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Polyester Film, Inc. 2001 Hood Road Greer SC 29650 / US | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Polyester Film, LLC 2001 Hood Road Greer South Carolina 29650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARLOW, Chadwick, Edward 4523 Preston Drive Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 02 /
CARLSON, Charles, David, Jr. 677 White Oak Mountain Road Columbus, NC 28722 / US | 03 /
POSEY, Robert, Giles 157 Berry's Pond Drive Duncan, SC 29334 / US | 04 /
GARNER, Gary, Ralph 120 Fairview Place Greer, SC 29651 / US | 05 /
FOXHALL, Russell, Scott 9 Wildcherry Circle Lyman, SC 29365 / US | [2007/13] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
MARLOW, Chadwick, Edward 6790 New Cut Road Inman, SC 29349 / US | ||
02 /
CARLSON, Charles, David, Jr. 677 White Oak Mountain Road Columbus, NC 28722 / US | |||
03 /
POSEY, Robert, Giles 157 Berry's Pond Drive Duncan, SC 29334 / US | |||
04 /
GARNER, Gary, Ralph 120 Fairview Place Greer, SC 29651 / US | |||
05 /
FOXHALL, Russell, Scott 9 Wildcherry Circle Lyman, SC 29365 / US | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2006/13] | Schweitzer, Klaus Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04755356.5 | 15.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004US19133 | Priority number, date | US20030479037P | 17.06.2003 Original published format: US 479037 P | US20040866897 | 14.06.2004 Original published format: US 866897 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004113043 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1638748 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1638748 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, // C08L67/02 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (KR);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1328 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1331 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/27] | B29C31/00, // C08J5/18 | ||
Former IPC [2006/13] | B29C31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | POLYESTERHARZ AUF PROPANDIOLBASIS UND SCHRUMPFFOLIE | [2006/13] | English: | PROPANE DIOL-BASED POLYESTER RESIN AND SHRINK FILM | [2006/13] | French: | RESINE DE POLYESTER A BASE DE PROPANE DIOL ET FILM THERMORETRACTABLE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2004 | AT | 17.07.2013 | BE | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.06.2004 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 18.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2095267 (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]EP1227119 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 1-35 * claims 1-5 * | International search | [A]US2005163986 (MARLOW CHADWICK E [US], et al) | by applicant | US4996291 |