EP1636734 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING BIOMETRIC IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aprilis, Inc. 5 Clock Tower Place, Suite 200 Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEDELE, Vincent Post Office Box 061 Harvard, MA 01451 / US | 02 /
BERG, John, S. 58 Jefferson Road Franklin, MA 02038 / US | 03 /
BUTLER, Christopher, J. Suite 9, 269 Broadway Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 04 /
FARRAHER, Robert, David 24 Main Street 2 Somerville, MA 02145 / US | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04755715.2 | 21.06.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004US19713 | Priority number, date | US20030480008P | 21.06.2003 Original published format: US 480008 P | US20030519792P | 13.11.2003 Original published format: US 519792 P | US20030523068P | 18.11.2003 Original published format: US 523068 P | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005001752 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1636734 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
G06V40/1324 (EP,US);
G06V40/1353 (US);
G06V40/1359 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BIOMETRISCHEN BILDVERARBEITUNG | [2006/12] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING BIOMETRIC IMAGES | [2006/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES BIOMETRIQUES | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - JIANG X ET AL, "Detecting the fingerprint minutiae by adaptive tracing the gray-level ridge", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, KIDLINGTON, GB, (200105), vol. 34, no. 5, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 999 - 1013, XP004321319 [X] 1-25,82-106,163-168,175-179,186 * Section 2. "Adaptive tracing the ridge of a fingerprint", Section 3. "Minutiae detection", Section 4. "Post-processing" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-3203(00)00050-9 | [A] - VIZCAYA P R ET AL, MULTI-RESOLUTION FUZZY APPROACH FOR SINGULARITY DETECTION IN FINGERPRINT IMAGES, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, PAGE(S) 46-56, (19961119), ISSN 0277-786X, XP000957351 [A] 1-25,82-106,163-168,175-179,186 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.266803 |