EP1641839 - POLYMERIC COMPOSITION - CORROSION INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISCOGLIO, Michael, B. 164 Nebula Road Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | 02 /
DEVLIN, Kenneth, T. 19 Shawn Lane Bear, DE 19701 / US | 03 /
RUSSELL, Patrick, M. 4451 Wise Road Freeland, MI 48623 / US | 04 /
WRIGHT, David, P. 46 Whitby Circle Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | 05 /
CHAUDHARY, Bharat, I. 14 Michelle Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 06 /
KLIER, John 46 Millers Grove Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 07 /
BETSO, Stephen, R. 113 Distant View Drive Asheville, NC 28803 / US | 08 /
GROSS, Laurence, H. 977 Rector Road Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | [2007/14] |
Former [2006/14] | 01 /
BISCOGLIO, Michael, B. 164 Nebula Road Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | ||
02 /
DEVLIN, Kenneth, T. 207 Chatsworth Drive Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | |||
03 /
RUSSELL, Patrick, M. 4451 Wise Road Freeland, MI 48623 / US | |||
04 /
WRIGHT, David, P. 46 Whitby Circle Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | |||
05 /
CHAUDHARY, Bharat, I. 14 Michelle Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
06 /
KLIER, John 46 Millers Grove Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | |||
07 /
BETSO, Stephen, R. 113 Distant View Drive Asheville, NC 28803 / US | |||
08 /
GROSS, Laurence, H. 977 Rector Road Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/30] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2006/14] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04755816.8 | 22.06.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004US19905 | Priority number, date | US20030483271P | 25.06.2003 Original published format: US 483271 P | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005003220 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1641839 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1641839 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C08K11/00 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
H01B3/18 (EP,US);
C08F8/42 (EP,US);
C08K11/00 (EP,US);
H01B7/2806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | KORROSIONSINHIBIERENDE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/14] | English: | POLYMERIC COMPOSITION - CORROSION INHIBITORS | [2006/14] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMERIQUE INHIBANT LA CORROSION | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 28.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2004 | AT | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | CZ | 24.07.2013 | DK | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | ES | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | NL | 24.07.2013 | PL | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | TR | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.06.2004 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 25.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3976595 (SCOTT ROBERT H, et al) [Y] 1-26 * column 1, line 20 - line 60 * * claims 1-5 *; | [DY]WO0212355 (KING INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [DY] 1-26* claims 1-31 * |