EP1689454 - ODOR CONTROL IN PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACDONALD, John, Gavin 1472 Knollwood Terrace Decatur, GA 30033 / US | 02 /
QUINCY, Roger, Bradshaw, III 5520 Tallantworth Trail Cumming, GA 30040 / US | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/33] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04756254.1 | 25.06.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004US20696 | Priority number, date | US20030723761 | 26.11.2003 Original published format: US 723761 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005056068 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1689454 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/46, B65D65/46 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
A61F13/8405 (EP,KR,US);
A61L15/46 (EP,KR,US);
A61L15/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/16 (KR);
A61L2300/102 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2300/108 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/33] | A61L15/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/10] |
Former [2006/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERUCHSKONTROLLE IN KÖRPERPFLEGEPRODUKTEN | [2006/33] | English: | ODOR CONTROL IN PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS | [2006/33] | French: | ELIMINATION DES ODEURS DANS DES PRODUITS DE SOINS PERSONNELS | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 05.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 27.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/39] | 12.05.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001031134 ; | [Y]GB2153779 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [Y] 12,13 * figures 3,4 * * claims 1-6 *; | [Y]EP0392528 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [Y] 12,13 * abstract * * page 4, line 4 - line 41 * * examples 1-7 * * claims 1-64 *; | [Y]WO9112029 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 12,13 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 23 * * claim 9 *; | [Y]US5071414 (ELLIOTT DONALD P [US]) [Y] 12,13 * the whole document *; | [X]US5569230 (FISHER DANIELLA J [US], et al) [X] 12,13 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 30 * * column 18, line 24 - column 19, line 43 *; | [Y]WO03051414 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [Y] 12,13 * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 14 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 21 * * claims 1-48 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 23, Database accession no. 2001-222405, XP002411934 & JP2001031134 A 20010206 (KIMOTO KK) [X] 12,13 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO9112029 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-10,16 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 23 * * claim 9 *; | [X]WO03051414 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-10,16 * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 14 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 21 * * claims 1-48 *; | [X]EP0392528 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-10,16 * abstract * * page 4, line 4 - line 41 * * examples 1-7 * * claims 1-64 * |