EP1545199 - INSECT DUAL BAIT STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S. C. Johnson & Son, Inc. 1525 Howe Street Racine, WI 53403 / US | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTPHAL, Nathan, R. 1010 Appaloosa Trail Racine, WI 53402 / US | 02 /
BROWER, David, O. 529 West Boulevard Racine, WI 53405 / US | 03 /
KEYEL, Richard, E. 117 Augusta Street Racine, WI 53402 / US | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04756483.6 | 30.06.2004 | [2005/26] | WO2004US21111 | Priority number, date | US20030610781 | 01.07.2003 Original published format: US 610781 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005004596 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545199 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545199 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01M1/20 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
A01M1/2011 (EP,US);
A01M1/22 (KR);
A01M1/00 (KR);
A01M1/2005 (EP,US);
A01M2200/011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELKÖDERSTATION FÜR INSEKTEN | [2005/26] | English: | INSECT DUAL BAIT STATION | [2005/26] | French: | STATION DOUBLE POUR ATTIRER LES INSECTES | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 02.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2006 | BE | 26.04.2006 | CH | 26.04.2006 | CY | 26.04.2006 | CZ | 26.04.2006 | EE | 26.04.2006 | FI | 26.04.2006 | LI | 26.04.2006 | NL | 26.04.2006 | PL | 26.04.2006 | RO | 26.04.2006 | SI | 26.04.2006 | SK | 26.04.2006 | TR | 26.04.2006 | IE | 30.06.2006 | LU | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | BG | 26.07.2006 | DK | 26.07.2006 | SE | 26.07.2006 | PT | 26.09.2006 | HU | 27.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2006 | ||
EE | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
PL | 26.04.2006 | ||
RO | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SK | 26.04.2006 | ||
TR | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
LU | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
HU | 27.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2006 | ||
EE | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
PL | 26.04.2006 | ||
RO | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SK | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
HU | 27.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2006 | ||
EE | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
PL | 26.04.2006 | ||
RO | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SK | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2006 | ||
EE | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
PL | 26.04.2006 | ||
RO | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SK | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
PL | 26.04.2006 | ||
RO | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SK | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
IT | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
PL | 26.04.2006 | ||
RO | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SK | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
PL | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SK | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
PL | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SK | 26.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
PL | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SK | 26.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SI | 26.04.2006 | |
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 26.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4747230 (ZALESKY DEAN R [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 44; figure 2 *; | [A]US4761912 (DYER ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1,13* figures 2,6 *; | [XY]US5960585 (DEMAREST SCOTT W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-12 * column 4 - column 8; figures 1,2,7,8 * [Y] 3-5,13-15,17-20; | [Y]US6272791 (PLEASANTS DONALD A [US]) [Y] 3-5,13-15,17-20 * figures 25,26 * | by applicant | US4387969 | US4563836 | US4793093 | US4837969 | US5548922 | US5802761 | US5906585 | US5960585 |