EP1648411 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | 12.11.2010 | Change - classification | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | 12.11.2010 | Change - classification | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | ||
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADUSUMILLI, Prasad 1500 Littleton Road Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 02 /
KIM, Chungbin 1500 Littleton Road Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 03 /
LECH, Stanley, J. 1500 Littleton Road Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 04 /
MEHTA, Naresh, I. 1500 Littleton Road Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 05 /
DINNER, Dara, L. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Morris, Miriam Elizabeth, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Morris, Miriam Elizabeth, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04756833.2 | 09.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004US22082 | Priority number, date | US20030486033P | 10.07.2003 Original published format: US 486033 P | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005007105 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1648411 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K9/20 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/2009 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/0065 (EP,US);
A61K9/2013 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/205 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/10] | A61K9/10, A61K9/20, A61K9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/17] | A61K9/10, A61K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | 09.02.2006 | LT | 09.02.2006 | LV | 09.02.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2006/17] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS | [2006/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 11.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/50] | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0455475 (RECKITT & COLMANN PROD LTD [GB]) [I] 1-17 * page 3, line 13 - line 24 * * examples 9, 10 * * claim - *; | [I]WO9963986 (RECKITT & COLMANN PROD LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-17 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 18 * * page 12, line 20 - line 28 * * example 1 *; | [I]US6277409 (LUBER JOSEPH R [US], et al) [I] 1-12* examples 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US4327076 (PUGLIA WAYNE J, et al) |