EP1668576 - TERM-BASED CONCEPT MARKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Change - representative | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2008/48] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Overture Services, Inc. 74 North Pasadena Avenue, 3rd Floor Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLAKE, Gary, William 633 Chaparral Court Altadena, CA 91001 / US | 02 /
PENNOCK, David, M. 1 Dipierro Drive Monroe Township, NJ 08831 / US | [2007/18] |
Former [2006/24] | 01 /
FLAKE, Gary, William 633 Chaparral Court Altadena, CA 91001 / US | ||
02 /
PENNOCK, David, M. 330 Cordova Street, Unit 264 Pasadena, CA 91101 / US | Representative(s) | Pelly, Jason Charles, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Pelly, Jason Charles, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2006/24] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04757183.1 | 21.07.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US23485 | Priority number, date | US20030625082 | 22.07.2003 Original published format: US 625082 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005010718 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668576 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONZEPTMARKT AUF TERM-BASIS | [2006/24] | English: | TERM-BASED CONCEPT MARKET | [2006/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMERCIALISATION REPOSANT SUR UN CONCEPT FONDE SUR DES TERMES | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - The technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 92 EPC) are considered part of common general knowledge. Due to their notoriety no documentary evidence is found to be required. For further details see the accompanying Opinion and the reference below., XP002456252 [L] 1-39 | International search | [Y]US5794233 (RUBINSTEIN SEYMOUR I [US]); | [Y]US6269361 (DAVIS DARREN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2002091621 (CONKLIN CURT [US], et al); | [Y]US2002138445 (LAAGE DOMINIC P [US], et al) |