EP1606873 - MULTIPHASE MOTOR HAVING DIFFERENT WINDING CONFIGURATIONS FOR RESPECTIVE SPEED RANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA MANUFACTURING & SERVICES SAS 4, rue de Presbourg 75116 Paris / FR | [2006/48] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Wavecrest Laboratories, LLC 45600 Terminal Drive Dulles, VA 20166 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PYNTIKOV, Alexander 21184 Sundial Court Ashburn, VA 20147 / US | 02 /
MASLOV, Boris, A. 10814 Oldfield Drive Reston, VA 20191 / US | 03 /
GLADKOV, Alexander, A. 9808 Laurel Street Fairfax, VA 22032 / US | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2006/41] | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/51] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04758345.5 | 25.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004US09173 | Priority number, date | US20030396482 | 26.03.2003 Original published format: US 396482 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004088832 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1606873 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1606873 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/00, H02P6/14 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
H02P6/14 (EP,US);
H02P25/18 (KR);
H02P6/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Title | German: | MEHRPHASENMOTOR MIT VERSCHIEDENEN WICKLUNGSKONFIGURATIONEN FÜR JEWEILIGE GESCHWINDIGKEITSBEREICHE | [2005/51] | English: | MULTIPHASE MOTOR HAVING DIFFERENT WINDING CONFIGURATIONS FOR RESPECTIVE SPEED RANGES | [2005/51] | French: | MOTEUR MULTIPHASE AYANT DIFFERENTES CONFIGURATIONS D'ENROULEMENTS POUR DES PLAGES DE VITESSES RESPECTIVES | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2004 | AT | 31.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | IT | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | GB | 25.03.2013 | IE | 25.03.2013 | LU | 25.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
GB | 25.03.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
GB | 25.03.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 31.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3984750 (PFEFFER PETER, et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 9; figures 1-3 * [A] 3-9,12,13; | [X]WO9808291 (RIVERA NICHOLAS N [US]) [X] 1,10 * page 2, line 21 - page 12, line 25; figures 1-8 *; | [XA]US6359800 (LIANG FENG [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 37; figures 1-3 * [A] 3-9,12,13; | [X]US6493924 (DAS A KUMAR [US]) [X] 1,10* column 2, line 39 - column 5, line 25; figures 1-4 * |