EP1610942 - ABRASION-RESISTANT COMPOSITES WITH IN-SITU ACTIVATED BINDER RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xymid L.L.C. 9307 Summerlook Place Chesterfield, VA 23832 / US | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSIARKEZOS, Stephen H. 26 Laurel Run Road Elkton, MD 21921 / US | 02 /
ZAFIROGLU, Dimitri P. 303 Pentland Drive Centreville, DE 19807 / US | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Bowman, Paul Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Bowman, Paul Alan Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04758566.6 | 30.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004US09657 | Priority number, date | US20030403208 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: US 403208 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004087393 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1610942 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/02, B29C70/24, D04H1/48, D04H11/08 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
D04H11/08 (EP,US);
B29C70/24 (EP,US);
D04H1/48 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0087 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23957 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23979 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23986 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24033 (EP,US);
Y10T442/273 (EP,US);
Y10T442/662 (EP,US);
Y10T442/667 (EP,US);
Y10T442/682 (EP,US);
Y10T442/684 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/01] | B32B3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABRIEBBESTÄNDIGE VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE MIT INSITU-AKTIVIERTEM BINDEMITTELHARZ | [2006/01] | English: | ABRASION-RESISTANT COMPOSITES WITH IN-SITU ACTIVATED BINDER RESIN | [2006/01] | French: | COMPOSITES RESISTANT A L'ABRASION COMPRENANT UNE RESINE LIANTE ACTIVEE IN SITU | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 02.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.01.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2376984 (HANDELSBOLAGET EVAKSYSTEM EKST [SE]) [X] 7,9,13 * page 4, paragraphs 1,2; figure 2; claims 1-6 *[I] 1-3,11; | [XI]US4888228 (SIDLES JAMES [US]) [X] 7,9,13,14,18 * column 4, lines 13-66; figures 2,3 * [I] 11,19,20; | [XAI]WO9635578 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,10 * claims 1-5,7,10,13 * * page 4, line 22 - page 7, line 5 * * page 13, line 38 - page 14, line 10; example 1 * [A] 2,3,6,8,9,13,14,16,18 [I] 5,11,12,15,17,19,20; | [XAI]US6063473 (ZAFIROGLU DIMITRI PETER [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10,13-15 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 5; figures 1-4 * * column 7, line 4; claims 1,4,5,8 * [A] 16,18 [I] 11,17,19,20 | International search | [X]US6063473 (ZAFIROGLU DIMITRI PETER [US]); | [X]US4888228 (SIDLES JAMES [US]); | [X]US6503595 (KIM SEHYUN [US], et al); | [Y]US5880043 (LORENZ GEORG MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [Y]US5902663 (JUSTESEN KNUD ERIK [DK], et al); | [A]US6051300 (FINK WILBERT E [US]); | [A]US5075142 (ZAFIROGLU DIMITRI P [US]); | [A]US6645610 (REIS CARL ANDREW [US], et al); | [A]US4421809 (BISH STEVEN S [US], et al) |