EP1611506 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING CONCEPT UNITS FROM SEARCH QUERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Excalibur IP, LLC 140 East 45th Street, 15th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [2018/07] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Excalibur IP, LLC 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Yahoo, Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPUR, Shyam 1030 Heatherstone Way Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
JOSHI, Deepa 900 Pepper Tree Lane, Apt 1413 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/11] | 01 /
KAPUR, Shyam 955 Escalon Avenue, 309 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | ||
02 /
JOSHI, Deepa 900 Pepper Tree Lane, Apt 1413 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | |||
Former [2006/01] | 01 /
KAPUR, Shyam 955 Escalon Avenue, 309 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | ||
02 /
JOSHI, Deepa 900 Pepper Tree Lane, 1614 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2006/01] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04758861.1 | 02.04.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004US10386 | Priority number, date | US20030460222P | 04.04.2003 Original published format: US 460222 P | US20030713576 | 12.11.2003 Original published format: US 713576 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004090670 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1611506 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1611506 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F7/00 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F16/3338 (EP,US);
G06F7/00 (KR);
Y10S707/959 (US);
Y10S707/99934 (US);
Y10S707/99935 (US);
|
Former IPC [2006/01] | G06F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 17.10.2005 | HR | 17.10.2005 | LT | 17.10.2005 | LV | 17.10.2005 | MK | 17.10.2005 | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON KONZEPTEINHEITEN AUS SUCHABFRAGEN | [2006/01] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING CONCEPT UNITS FROM SEARCH QUERIES | [2006/01] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE GENERER DES UNITES CONCEPTUELLES A PARTIR DE REQUETES | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 23.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2004 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | IE | 02.04.2019 | LU | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
IE | 02.04.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
IE | 02.04.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6389406 (REED FREDERICK W [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * abstract ** column 5, line 37 - line 65 * | International search | [A]US6006221 (LIDDY ELIZABETH D [US], et al); | [Y]US6363373 (STEINKRAUS DAVID W [US]); | [Y]US6539348 (BOND DOUGLAS G [US], et al); | [AP]US2003069880 (HARRISON TOM [US], et al); | [YE]US6772150 (WHITMAN RONALD M [US], et al) | by applicant | US6363373 | US6389406 |