EP1613934 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REAL-TIME VIBRATION IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SRI International 330 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELESE, Philip 674 Arastradero Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Robert, A. 3321 Thomas Drive Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 03 /
HONEY, Richard, C. 1801 Parkwood Drive San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 04 /
AGUERO, Victor 17269 Debbie Road Los Gatos, CA 95055 / US | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Coyle, Philip Aidan 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2009/42] | Coyle, Philip Aidan FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/42] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Cabinet Bloch & Associés 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/02] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Bloch & Associés 2 Square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04758884.3 | 02.04.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004US10423 | Priority number, date | US20030460542P | 03.04.2003 Original published format: US 460542 P | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004090485 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1613934 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01H9/00, A61B5/11, G01N29/46 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
A61B5/11 (EP,US);
A61B5/0071 (EP,US);
A61B5/1101 (EP,US);
G01H9/002 (EP,US);
G01N29/2418 (EP,US);
G01N29/46 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US);
A61B5/7228 (EP,US);
A61B5/7257 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/02] | G01H9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ECHTZEIT-VIBRATIONSABBILDUNG | [2006/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REAL-TIME VIBRATION IMAGING | [2006/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE DE VIBRATION EN TEMPS REEL | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 02.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4843233 (JEUNHOMME LUC [FR]) [X] 1,12,34,35 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 5, line 24 - line 44 * [Y] 13-15,28,29,31,43,44; | [XYI]US5402235 (MONCHALIN JEAN-PIERRE [CA]) [X] 1-7,11,21-24,27,34,37,38,42,46-48 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1, 2, 4 * * column 1, line 6 - line 38 * * column 2, line 43 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 44 - line 49 * * column 4, line 16 - line 18 * * column 4, line 22 - line 46 * * column 4, line 61 - line 64 * [Y] 13-15,28,29,31,43,44 [I] 20,49; | [XAI]US6055391 (JACKSON WARREN B [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,12,21,25,30,34,35,38,45 * abstract * * figures 1, 5 * * column 2, line 28 * * column 4, line 55 - line 60 * * column 5, line 1 - line 8 * * column 7, line 20 - line 25 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 8 * * column 11, line 15 * * column 11, line 30 - line 45 * [A] 49 [I] 20,26; | [A]WO0114825 (STEVENS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 49 * abstract * * figure 3b ** page 8, line 16 - line 31 *; | [XI]JP2001241919 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,4-7,16-19,21-23,25,27,34,36,38,42,46 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0068] * [I] 20; | [Y]US2002143245 (RATHER JOHN D G [US], et al) [Y] 29,31,44 * figures 1, 4 *; | [XI]US2002145588 (MCCAHON STEPHEN WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9,21,23,27,34,39,40,42 * abstract * * figures 1, 5 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0068] * [I] 10,20,41 | International search | [A]US4905202 (ROBILLARD JEAN J A [US]); | [X]US5005419 (O'DONNELL MATTHEW [US], et al); | [Y]US6134006 (TELSCHOW KENNETH L [US], et al); | [X]US2002143245 (RATHER JOHN D G [US], et al) | by applicant | US5402235 | JP2001241919 | US2002145588 | US6055391 | US4843233 | US2002143245 | WO0114825 |