EP1613887 - PLASTIC TUBE JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states Cuno Incorporated 400 Research Parkway Meriden, CT 06450-1018 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARKS, Nathan, E. 9324 Creek Ridge Lane Savage, MN 55378 / US | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04759321.5 | 09.04.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004US10923 | Priority number, date | US20030412050 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: US 412050 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004092631 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1613887 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1613887 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16L39/00, F16L47/00 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
F16L47/02 (EP,US);
F16L13/0209 (EP,US);
F16L39/00 (EP,US);
F16L47/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/02] | F16L35/00, F16L39/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/29] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFROHRVERBINDUNG | [2006/02] | English: | PLASTIC TUBE JOINT | [2006/02] | French: | RACCORD POUR TUBE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.06.2011 | [2012/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3753575 (TRACY G) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, lines 35-58 * * column 2, lines 10,24 * * figures 1,4 *; | [Y]US4049034 (VCELKA JOHN LEONARD, et al) [Y] 1-15* column 2, lines 8-12; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2002017497 (FRITZE KARL [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0040]; figures 3,4; claim 1 * | International search | [X]US3753575 (TRACY G); | [Y]US5462313 (REA PERRY J [US], et al) | by applicant | US3753575 |