EP1622532 - DEVICE FOR DACRYOCYSTORHINOSTOMY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/06] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DACRYOCYSTORHINOSTOMY | ||
[2013/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biolitec Pharma Marketing Ltd. Level 6 (D) Main Office Tower Financial Park Labuan Jalan Merdeka, 87018 Labuan F.T. Labuan / MY | [2013/44] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states CeramOptec GmbH Siemensstrasse 44 53121 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMPLENIZZA, Paolo Via Feno, 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | 02 /
CALDERA, Tiziano 2, The Squires Field High street Great Wilbraham Cambridgeshire CB1 5TA / GB | 03 /
FONTANELLA, Walter Via Civerchi, 82 I-26013 Cremona / IT | [2013/46] |
Former [2006/06] | 01 /
TAMPLENIZZA, Paolo Via Feno, 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
CALDERA, Tiziano 2, The Squires Field High street Great Wilbraham Cambridgeshire CB1 5TA / GB | |||
03 /
FONTANELLA, Walter Via Civerchi, 82 I-26013 Cremona / IT | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Franz, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Herrmann, Franz, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04759331.4 | 07.04.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004US10973 | Priority number, date | US20030411592 | 10.04.2003 Original published format: US 411592 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004091431 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1622532 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1622532 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007, // A61B18/24 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
A61B18/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61F9/00772 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/40] | A61B18/20, // A61F9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/06] | A61B18/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2006/29] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DACRYOCYSTORHINOSTOMIE | [2013/22] | English: | DEVICE FOR DACRYOCYSTORHINOSTOMY | [2013/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DACRYOCYSTORHINOSTOMIE | [2013/22] |
Former [2006/06] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DACRYOCYSTORHINOSTOMIE | ||
Former [2006/06] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DACRYOCYSTORHINOSTOMY | ||
Former [2006/06] | DISPOSITIF ET METHODE POUR DACRYOCYSTORHINOSTOMIE | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19542955 (SCHWIND GMBH & CO KG HERBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,6,8 * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 56 * * column 3, lines 36-55 * * figures 3,5 * [Y] 7,9; | [Y]WO9823237 (LIONS EYE INST AUSTRALIA INC [AU], et al) [Y] 3 * page 13, lines 3-6 *; | [X]DE19744856 (SCHWIND GMBH & CO KG HERBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5954744 (PHAN LOC [US], et al) [Y] 9* column 2, lines 57-62 *; | [XY]DE19823755 (NEUHANN THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 36 * * claim 10 * * figure - * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US2002040716 (MANDELKORN ROBERT M [US]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0026] *; | [Y]WO0236029 (LIN J T [US]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * page 6, lines 16-28 * | International search | [Y]US5954744 (PHAN LOC [US], et al); | [X]US6251103 (BERLIN MICHAEL S [US]) |