EP1616307 - SMART CARD PERSONALIZATION ASSISTANCE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VISA INTERNATIONAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION 900 Metro Center Boulevard Foster City, CA 94308 / US | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Carl 5322 Matthew Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 02 /
HILL, Trudy 1200 E. Hillsdale Boulevard Apt. 118 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/05] |
Former [2011/09] | Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2011/07] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04759814.9 | 07.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004US10883 | Priority number, date | US20030464559P | 21.04.2003 Original published format: US 464559 P | US20030633020 | 31.07.2003 Original published format: US 633020 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004095382 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1616307 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06F16/2455 (US);
G06Q20/355 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIPKARTENPERSONALISIERUNGSHILFSWERKZEUG | [2006/03] | English: | SMART CARD PERSONALIZATION ASSISTANCE TOOL | [2006/03] | French: | OUTIL D'AIDE A LA PERSONNALISATION DE CARTE INTELLIGENTE | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 11.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 02.05.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 04.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Appeal following examination | 11.07.2012 | Appeal received No. T2062/12 | 11.09.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.02.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5748484 (CANNON THOMAS G [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * column 1, line 32 - line 41 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 15 * * column 8, line 6 - line 37 *; | [X]US5765142 (ALLRED SCOTT K [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * column 1, line 16 - line 23 * * column 2, line 57 - line 65 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 29 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 16 * * column 19, line 51 - column 20, line 21 *; | [X]US5889941 (TUSHIE DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 60 * * column 4, line 39 - line 55 * * column 6, line 31 - column 8, line 59 * * column 9, line 29 - line 40 * * column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 54 * * column 13, line 65 - column 14, line 10 * * column 15, line 27 - column 16, line 17 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO9919846 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - line 27 * * page 2, line 25 - line 7 * * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 5 * * page 7, line 2 - line 12 * * page 9, line 6 - line 15 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 5 * * page 13, line 19 - page 14, line 3 *; | [X]US6196459 (GOMAN ROBERT NEAL [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 7 * * column 1, line 42 - line 53 * * column 2, line 19 - line 52 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 47 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19958559 (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 45 * * column 4, line 14 - line 26 * * column 5, line 17 - line 40 *; | [X]US2001048677 (BOYS DONALD ROBERT MARTIN [US]) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0075] *; | [X]US6402028 (GRAHAM JR HARRY E [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 24 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 64 * * column 9, line 1 - line 15 * * column 10, line 62 - line 67 * * column 12, line 8 - line 52 * * column 20, line 50 - line 59 * * column 22, line 51 - line 62 *; | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Card Customization Guide, version 1.0", GLOBAL PLATFORM, (20020813), URL: http://www.globalplatform.org/specifications/systems/scriptspec_v1.1.0.zip, (20040728), XP002290605 [X] 1-35 * the whole document * | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Multi Application smart Card management Systems Functional Requirements, version 3.4", GLOBAL PLATFORM, (200105), URL: http://www.globalplatform.org/specifications/systems/sys-tech.zip, (20040728), XP002290606 [X] 1-35 * the whole document * |