EP1618606 - CIRCUIT DEVICE WITH AT LEAST PARTIAL PACKAGING AND METHOD FOR FORMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin, TX 78735 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin Texas 78735 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEAL, George 404 Paso Fino Cove Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | 02 /
ZHAO, Jie-Hua 5325 Mabry Court Austin, Texas 78749 / US | 03 /
PRACK, Edward, R. 102 Indian Bend Austin, Texas 78734 / US | 04 /
WENZEL, Robert, J. 13337 Kingman Drive Austin, Texas 78729 / US | 05 /
SAWYER, Brian, D. 750 E. 2nd Avenue Mesa, Arizona 85204 / US | 06 /
WONTOR, David, G. 6104 Open Rage Trail Austin, Texas 78749 / US | 07 /
MANGRUM, Marc Alan 3800 Cattleman Drive Manchaca, Texas 78652 / US | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Wray, Antony John, et al Optimus Patents Limited Peak Hill House Steventon Basingstoke, Hampshire RG25 3AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Wray, Antony John, et al Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2011/46] | Treleven, Colin, et al Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke Hampshire, RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2010/12] | Ferro, Frodo Nunes, et al Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a, Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close, Andover Hampshire SP10 3FG / GB | ||
Former [2008/20] | Ferro, Frodo Nunes, et al Freescale Semiconductor Inc c/o Impetus IP Ltd Groove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2006/04] | Wray, Antony John, et al Freescale Semiconductors,Inc c/o Impetus Limited, Grove House Lutyens Close, Chineham Court Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 04759949.3 | 06.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004US11871 | Priority number, date | US20030418790 | 18.04.2003 Original published format: US 418790 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004095514 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1618606 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/48, H01L21/56, H01L23/31, // H01L23/538, H01L21/60, H01L23/50 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
H01L23/3128 (EP,US);
H01L21/561 (EP,US);
H01L21/565 (EP,US);
H01L21/568 (EP,US);
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L23/50 (EP,US);
H01L23/5389 (EP,US);
H01L24/19 (EP,US);
H01L24/82 (EP,US);
H01L24/96 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L25/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/12105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/18 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L25/0655 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01058 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1461 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/18162 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/82 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/83 (US,EP);
H01L2924/1461, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2006/04] | H01L23/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSBAUSTEIN MIT MINDESTENS TEILWEISER KAPSELUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/04] | English: | CIRCUIT DEVICE WITH AT LEAST PARTIAL PACKAGING AND METHOD FOR FORMING | [2006/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF A CIRCUIT AU MOINS PARTIELLEMENT ENCAPSULE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FORMER CE DISPOSITIF A CIRCUIT | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US6159767 (EICHELBERGER CHARLES WILLIAM [US]) [I] 1-7 * the whole document * [A] 8-10; | [I]US2002025607 (DANNO TADATOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * figures 5-8 *; | [IA]WO0221595 (INTEL CORP [US]) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *[A] 8-10 | International search | [X]US6159767 (EICHELBERGER CHARLES WILLIAM [US]); | [X]WO0221595 (INTEL CORP [US]) |