EP1606830 - TRIMMINIG TEMPERATURE COEFFICIENTS OF ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microbridge Technologies Inc. 1980 Sherbrooke Street West Suite 505 Montréal, Québec H3H 1E8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Microbridge Technologies Inc. 1980 Sherbrooke Street West Suite 505 Montréal, Québec H3H 1E8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUDIN, Oleg 1566, Victor Hugo Place Montréal, Québec H3C 4P2 / CA | 02 /
LANDSBERGER, Leslie, M. 310 Elm Avenue Westmount, Québec H3Z 1Z5 / CA | 03 /
FROLOV, Gennadiy 2250 Guy Street, apt. 2001 Montréal, Québec H3H 2M3 / CA | 04 /
GRUDINA, Lyudmila 1566, Victor Hugo Place Montréal, Québec H3C 4P2 / CA | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/11] | 01 /
GRUDIN, Oleg 1566, Victor Hugo Place Montréal, Québec H3C 4P2 / CA | ||
02 /
LANDSBERGER, Leslie, M. 310 Elm Avenue Westmount, Québec H3Z 1Z5 / CA | |||
03 /
FROLOV, Gennadiy 2250 Guy Street Montréal, Québec H3H 2M3 / CA | |||
04 /
GRUDINA, Lyudmila 1566, Victor Hugo Place Montréal, Québec H3C 4P2 / CA | |||
Former [2005/51] | 01 /
GRUDIN, Oleg Apt. 2404, 1411 du Fort Street Montréal, Québec H3H 2N7 / CA | ||
02 /
LANDSBERGER, Leslie, M. 310 Elm Avenue Westmount, Québec H3Z 1Z5 / CA | |||
03 /
FROLOV, Gennadiy 2250 Guy Street Montréal, Québec H3Z 2M3 / CA | |||
04 /
GRUDINA, Lyudmila Apt. 2404,1411 du Fort Street Montréal, Québec H3H 2N7 / CA | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Harry RPK Patentanwälte Reinhardt, Pohlmann und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB Grünstrasse 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Reinhardt, Harry Reinhardt & Pohlmann Partnerschaft, Grünstrasse 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04760182.8 | 19.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004CA00397 | Priority number, date | US20030455855P | 20.03.2003 Original published format: US 455855 P | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004097860 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1606830 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01C17/26 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
H01C17/232 (EP,US);
H01C17/267 (EP,US);
H01L28/20 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRIMMEN DES TEMPERATURKOEFFIZIENTEN VON ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUELEMENTEN UND SCHALTUNGEN | [2005/51] | English: | TRIMMINIG TEMPERATURE COEFFICIENTS OF ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND CIRCUITS | [2005/51] | French: | REGLAGE DE COEFFICIENTS DE TEMPERATURE DE COMPOSANTS ET DE CIRCUITS ELECTRONIQUES | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 20.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2002008302 (SINGH VARUN [US], et al) [AD] 1-82 * the whole document *; | [A] - BABCOCK J A ET AL, "Polysilicon resistor trimming for packaged integrated circuits", ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING, 1993. TECHNICAL DIGEST., INTERNATIONAL WASHINGTON, DC, USA 5-8 DEC. 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19931205), ISBN 0-7803-1450-6, pages 247 - 250, XP010118446 [A] 1-82 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEDM.1993.347359 | [AD] - BABCOCK J A ET AL, "PRECISION ELECTRICAL TRIMMING OF VERY LOW TCR POLY-SIGE RESISTORS", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200006), vol. 21, no. 6, ISSN 0741-3106, pages 283 - 285, XP000951962 [AD] 1-82 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/55.843151 | [A] - FELDBAUMER D W ET AL, "Theory and application of polysilicon resistor trimming", SOLID STATE ELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (19951101), vol. 38, no. 11, ISSN 0038-1101, pages 1861 - 1869, XP004002629 [A] 1-82 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0038-1101(95)00031-N |