EP1620506 - POLYESTERS CONTAINING MICROFIBERS, AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Steven, M. 1908 Myleen Place Old Hickory, TN 37138 / US | 02 /
HAYES, Richard, Allen 2060 Fang Circle Beaumont, TX 77706 / US | 03 /
SAMUELS, Sam, Louis 34 Pelham Drive Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | 04 /
FRANCES, Arnold 5908 Leabrook Way Glen Allen, VA 23059 / US | [2007/07] |
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
HANSEN, Steven, M. 1908 Myleen Place Old Hickory, TN 37138 / US | ||
02 /
HAYES, Richard, Allen 6309 MilBrook Road Brentwood, TN 37027 / US | |||
03 /
SAMUELS, Sam, Louis 34 Pelham Drive Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | |||
04 /
FRANCES, Arnold 5908 Leabrook Way Glen Allen, VA 23059 / US | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04760506.8 | 16.03.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004US09433 | Priority number, date | US20030467342P | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 467342 P | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004099314 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1620506 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1620506 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08K7/02 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
C08J5/04 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08K7/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
D01F1/10 (EP,US);
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
D01F6/92 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08L1/00 (EP,US);
C08L2205/16 (EP,US);
C08L23/00 (EP,US);
C08L27/06 (EP,US);
C08L27/08 (EP,US);
C08L27/12 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (EP,US);
C08L33/20 (EP,US);
C08L61/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08L75/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/10 (EP,US);
C08L79/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K7/02, C08L67/02 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/32] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROFASERN ENTHALTENDE POLYESTER UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2006/05] | English: | POLYESTERS CONTAINING MICROFIBERS, AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING SAME | [2006/05] | French: | POLYESTERS CONTENANT DES MICROFIBRES ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 06.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.09.2010 | 21.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10185562.5 / EP2267077 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Request for further processing for: | 04.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO03044100 (DU PONT [US], et al) [PX] 1-29,32 * abstract * * page 9, lines 21-25 * * page 11, line 35 * * page 13, lines 5-13 * * page 20, lines 12,14 *; | [XA]US6068922 (VERCESI GIORGIO P [CH], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 19-24 * * column 2, lines 1-67 * * column 3, lines 48-67 * [A] 12,14-28; | [XA]WO02083794 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-11,30,31 * claims 1-21 * * page 4 * * page 6 * [A] 12; | [X]US6103779 (GUZAUSKAS ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 * * column 6 * * column 16 *; | [X]JPH02191635 ; | [A]JPH1029434 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901011), vol. 0144, no. 66, Database accession no. (C - 0768), & JP2191635 A 19900727 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD; others: 01) [X] 1-11,30 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890517), vol. 0132, no. 11, Database accession no. (C - 597), & JP1029434 A 19890131 (ASUKU:KK) [A] 1-29,31 * abstract * | by applicant | WO03044100 | US6068922 | WO02083794 | JPH02191635 | US6103779 | EP1300445 | JP2000256505 | US3869430 | US3869429 | US20033767756 |