EP1627288 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING PREFERENCE ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridge Associates, LLC 747 Third avenue, Suite 32A New York, NY 10017 / US | [2006/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWSOM, Michael, L. 902 Wyngate Court Saftey Harbor, FL 34695 / US | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2006/08] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04760729.6 | 06.05.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004US14277 | Priority number, date | US20030468480P | 06.05.2003 Original published format: US 468480 P | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004099938 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1627288 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/00, G06Q99/00 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/08] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Extension states | AL | 02.12.2005 | HR | 02.12.2005 | LT | 02.12.2005 | LV | 02.12.2005 | MK | 02.12.2005 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER PRÄFERENZANALYSE | [2006/08] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING PREFERENCE ANALYSIS | [2006/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UNE ANALYSE DE PREFERENCE | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 23.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002184147 (BOULGER GORDON D [US]); | [A]US6360211 (ANDERSON MICHAEL W [US], et al) |