EP1629361 - A NEW GRAMMAR FOR REGULAR EXPRESSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alderson, David H. 535 21st Avenue St. Petersburg, FL 33704 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Alderson, David H. 20 Waterside Plaza, Apt. 19B New York, NY 10010-2616 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALDERSON, David H. 535 21st Avenue St. Petersburg, Florida 33704 / US | 02 /
NUSS, Andrew 535 21st Avenue St. Petersburg, Florida 33704 / US | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/09] | 01 /
ALDERSON, David H. 20 Waterside Plaza, Apt. 19B New York, NY 10010-2616 / US | ||
02 /
NUSS, Andrew 763 Summer Drive Acworth, GA 30102 / US | Representative(s) | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04760862.5 | 03.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004US13590 | Priority number, date | US20030469036P | 06.05.2003 Original published format: US 469036 P | US20030691414 | 22.10.2003 Original published format: US 691414 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004102315 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1629361 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G06F9/44, G06F9/45 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
G06F8/31 (EP,US);
G06F8/425 (EP,US);
G06F8/427 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99936 (US)
|
Former IPC [2006/09] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Title | German: | NEUE GRAMMATIK FÜR REGULÄRE AUSDRÜCKE | [2006/09] | English: | A NEW GRAMMAR FOR REGULAR EXPRESSIONS | [2006/09] | French: | GRAMMAIRE POUR EXPRESSIONS REGULIERES | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 18.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/12] | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - Microsoft, ".NET Framework Regular Expressions", (20030403), MSDN, URL: http://msdn.microsoft.com/en-us/library/hs600312(d=printer,v=VS.71).aspx, (20111202), XP002665095 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * | [Y] - "Sections 3.5, 4.9", Alfred V. Aho, Ravi Sethi, Jeffrey D. Ullman, Compilers - Principles, Techniques, and Tools, Reading, MA, USA, Addison-Wesley, (198603), 120/87, ISBN 0-201-10088-6, XP002665463 [Y] 1-26 * page 109; figure 3.18 * * page 262; figure 4.57 * | [A] - "Chapter 9: .NET", FRIEDL J., Mastering Regular Expression, O'REILLY, (200207), vol. 2, pages 399 - 432, XP002665094 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6425119 (JONES MARK A [US], et al); | [A]US2002133819 (JACKSON PAUL [GB]); | [X] - FRIEDL J. ET AL, Mastering Regular Expression - pg 4:14-17; 38:2-4; 33:1-4, O'REILLY, (200207), vol. 2, XP008163738 |