EP1673608 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HISTOLOGICAL TISSUE SPECIMEN PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vision Biosystems Limited 495 Blackburn Road Mt Waverley, Victoria 3149 / AU | [2006/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINDEYER, Victor Camfield Unit 2/25 Bapaume Road Mosman, New South Wales 2088 / AU | 02 /
DRUMMOND, Michael Houston 4 Inglis Court Glen Waverley, Victoria 3150 / AU | 03 /
QUITTNER, Victor Henry 4 Primrose Crescent Brighton East, Victoria 3187 / AU | 04 /
BURNS, Gregory Keith 28 Bales Street Mount Waverley, Victoria 3149 / AU | 05 /
MURRAY, Alexander David 5 Selwyn Lane Mount Dandenong, Victoria 3767 / AU | 06 /
TARBET, Fiona Mary 19 Hotham Street Mont Albert, Victoria 3127 / AU | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Parry, Simon James Mewburn Ellis LLP Bridgewater House Whitworth Street Manchester M1 6LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Parry, Simon James Mewburn Ellis LLP Bridgewater House Whitworth Street Manchester M1 6LT / GB | ||
Former [2008/16] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2006/26] | Parry, Simon James Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04761372.4 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/26] | WO2004AU01337 | Priority number, date | AU20030905301 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: AU 2003905301 | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031312 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1673608 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/31, G01N35/00, G05D7/00, B01L3/16 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
G01N35/00594 (EP,US);
B01L3/16 (EP,US);
G01N1/31 (EP,US);
G01N35/00663 (EP,US);
G01N35/0092 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00673 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG HISTOLOGISCHER GEWEBEPROBEN | [2006/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HISTOLOGICAL TISSUE SPECIMEN PROCESSING | [2006/26] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SPECIMENS DE TISSU HISTOLOGIQUE | [2006/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5357095 (WEYRAUCH BRUCE [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11 * column 12, line 10 - column 13, line 42 *; | [X]EP0753745 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5,9,34 * column 2, lines 21-35 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 32 *; | [X]US5839091 (RHETT NORMAN K [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 9, line 1 - column 11, line 19 *; | [X]US2001055799 (BAUNOCH DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9,34* the whole document *; | [X]US2002131896 (HUNNELL JACK E [US], et al) [X] 1-16,34,35 * paragraphs [0028] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0076] - [0091] *; | [X]WO03029845 (VISION BIOSYSTEMS LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-16,34,35 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US3889014 (KINNEY THOMAS D, et al); | [X]US4141312 (LOUDER NEVITT M, et al); | [Y]US6096561 (TAYI APPARAO [US]); | [X]US2002131896 (HUNNELL JACK E [US], et al); | [X]WO03029845 (VISION BIOSYSTEMS LTD [AU], et al) |