EP1663581 - TOOL FOR MACHINING SURFACES, EDGE AREAS AND CONTOURS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Profin Progressive Finish AG Gewerbe Blattig 6012 Obernau / CH | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOGEL, Josef Krebsbärenhalde 5 CH-6048 Horw / CH | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Bruderer, Werner Patentanwaltskanzlei Oberhittnauerstrasse 12 8330 Pfäffikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Bruderer, Werner Patentanwaltskanzlei Oberhittnauerstrasse 12 8330 Pfäffikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 04761879.8 | 26.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004CH00538 | Priority number, date | CH20030001531 | 08.09.2003 Original published format: CH 153103 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023491 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663581 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663581 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B24D13/14, A46B13/00 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B24D13/145 (EP,US);
B24B9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUR BEARBEITUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN, KANTENBEREICHEN UND KONTUREN | [2006/23] | English: | TOOL FOR MACHINING SURFACES, EDGE AREAS AND CONTOURS | [2006/23] | French: | OUTIL POUR USINER DES SURFACES, DES ZONES D'ARETE ET DES CONTOURS | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 27.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.01.2007 | DK | 03.01.2007 | EE | 03.01.2007 | FI | 03.01.2007 | IE | 03.01.2007 | NL | 03.01.2007 | PL | 03.01.2007 | RO | 03.01.2007 | SI | 03.01.2007 | SK | 03.01.2007 | TR | 03.01.2007 | BG | 03.04.2007 | SE | 03.04.2007 | GR | 04.04.2007 | PT | 04.06.2007 | HU | 04.07.2007 | LU | 26.08.2007 | BE | 31.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
HU | 04.07.2007 | ||
LU | 26.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | FI | 03.01.2007 | |
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0983825 (HILZINGER THUM SCHLEIF UND POL [DE]) [DA] 1* page 3, column 3, paragraph 22 - column 4, paragraph 28 * |