EP1706796 - TIMEPIECE COMPRISING TWO TURBILLONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GFPI SA Rue du Manège 19-21 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSEY, Stephen, Edward, Methuen La Rançonnière-Dessus 1 CH-2400 Le Locle / CH | 02 /
GREUBEL, Robert Route du Château 41 CH-2520 La Neuveville / CH | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Bovard SA Neuchâtel Rue des Noyers 11 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | GLN Rue du Puits-Godet 8a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 04761967.1 | 18.10.2004 | [2006/40] | WO2004CH00627 | Priority number, date | CH186503 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: CH 186503 | [2006/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005043257 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1706796 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1706796 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G04B17/06 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
G04B17/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2007/06] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UHR MIT ZWEI TOURBILLON UHRWERKEN | [2006/40] | English: | TIMEPIECE COMPRISING TWO TURBILLONS | [2006/40] | French: | PIECE D'HORLOGERIE COMPORTANT DEUX TOURBILLONS | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 04.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2375619 (PAUL GERARD * D'SOUZA) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [A]CH156801 (VUILLEUMIER,MARCEL) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |