EP1646557 - AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telair International GmbH Bodenschneidstrasse 2 83714 Miesbach / DE | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Thomas Dekan-Maier-Weg 48 83727 Schliersee / DE | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04763269.0 | 15.07.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004EP07921 | Priority number, date | DE2003132798 | 18.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10332798 | DE2003139507 | 27.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339507 | DE2003139508 | 27.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339508 | DE20044011163 | 08.03.2004 Original published format: DE 4011163 | DE20044011164 | 08.03.2004 Original published format: DE 4011164 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005012084 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1646557 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1646557 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/20, B64C1/22, B64C1/00, B64D9/00 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
B64C1/20 (EP,US);
B64C1/061 (EP,US);
B64C1/064 (EP,US);
B64C1/065 (EP,US);
B64C1/068 (EP,US);
B64C1/18 (US);
B64C1/22 (EP,US);
B64D11/02 (EP,US);
B64D9/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/43] |
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUGZEUG | [2006/16] | English: | AIRCRAFT | [2006/16] | French: | AERONEF | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3381921 (MCDONOUGH FRANCIS M, et al); | [A]DE2162042 ; | [A]US4929133 (WISEMAN ALBERT D [US]) |