EP1648574 - Transport device for golf clubs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/17] | TRANSPORT DEVICE FOR GOLF CLUBS | ||
[2009/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manuel-Ferreira-Godinho GmbH & Co. KG Bergiusweg 10 31787 Hameln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states M. Ferreira-Godhinho GmbH & Co. KG Bergiusweg 10 31787 Hameln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERREIRA-GODINHO, Manuel Bergiusweg 10 31787 Hameln / DE | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04763271.6 | 15.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004EP07923 | Priority number, date | DE2003132796 | 18.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10332796 | [2006/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005009549 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1648574 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1648574 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63B55/10 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
A63B55/10 (EP);
A63B55/20 (EP);
A63B55/408 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Transportvorrichtung für Golfschläger | [2009/07] | English: | Transport device for golf clubs | [2009/07] | French: | Dispositif de transport pour cannes de golf | [2009/07] |
Former [2006/17] | TRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG FÜR GOLFSCHLÄGER | ||
Former [2006/17] | TRANSPORT DEVICE FOR GOLF CLUBS | ||
Former [2006/17] | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT POUR CANNES DE GOLF | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 04.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2008 | 31.07.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.12.2009 | CZ | 16.12.2009 | DK | 16.12.2009 | EE | 16.12.2009 | FI | 16.12.2009 | IE | 16.12.2009 | NL | 16.12.2009 | PL | 16.12.2009 | RO | 16.12.2009 | SE | 16.12.2009 | SI | 16.12.2009 | SK | 16.12.2009 | TR | 16.12.2009 | BG | 16.03.2010 | GR | 17.03.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | HU | 17.06.2010 | LU | 15.07.2010 | BE | 31.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
LU | 15.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CZ | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CZ | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | EE | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SE | 16.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2267226 (CORBETT WHITE JAMES) [X] 1-11,16-26 * page 1; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2990865 (HOMER STEELE) [X] 1-9,16-26 * column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 25; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US3215181 (ROBERT REED ROLAND) [X] 1-11,16-26 * column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 36; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US3219083 (ASQUITH BLAKE W) [X] 1-9,16-26 * column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 51; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US3399939 (ANDERSON IVAR C) [A] 10-13,16,19-21,23-25* column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 51; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4747490 (SMITH FRED [US]) [X] 1-13,16,19-26 * column 1, line 38 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5209539 (ATALAY MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-9,16,17,19-26 * column 4, line 1 - column 7, line 32; figures 1-4 * |