EP1695391 - SCANNING HEAD FOR OPTICAL POSITIONAL MEASURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPECKBACHER, Peter Lindenstrasse 21 84558 Kirchweidach / DE | 02 /
WEIDMANN, Josef Kirchenstrasse 2 83308 Trostberg / DE | 03 /
EISELE, Christopher Parzing 4 83374 Traunwalchen / DE | 04 /
MAYER, Elmar Am Höllberg 5 83365 Nussdorf / DE | 05 /
BURGSCHAT, Reiner Ammerbacher Strasse 109 07745 Jena / DE | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/46] | Application number, filing date | 04763589.1 | 29.07.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004EP08483 | Priority number, date | DE2003157654 | 10.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10357654 | [2006/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005057668 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1695391 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1695391 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/105, G01D5/347 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
G01D5/34707 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/1055 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/548 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Title | German: | ABTASTKOPF FÜR OPTISCHE POSITIONSMESSSYSTEME | [2006/35] | English: | SCANNING HEAD FOR OPTICAL POSITIONAL MEASURING SYSTEM | [2006/35] | French: | TETE DE BALAYAGE POUR SYSTEME DE MESURE DE POSITION OPTIQUE | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2004 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | NL | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | ES | 25.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | AT | 29.07.2013 | IE | 29.07.2013 | LU | 29.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
AT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 29.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
AT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 29.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 29.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 14.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2002021450 (AOKI TOSHIHIKO [JP]) [Y] 1-3,7,9,11,13-17 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-7 * [A] 4-6,8,10,12; | [Y]GB1269634 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [Y] 1-3,7,9,11,13-17 * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 56; figure 1 *; | [YA]DE19961250 (CIS INST FUER MIKROSENSORIK GG [DE]) [Y] 9,11 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 39; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-8,10,12-17; | [A]EP1182705 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0032]; figures 4-6 *; | [A]WO0184083 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 17, paragraph 3; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2002018220 (AOKI TOSHIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-3,13 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]JP2003227735 ; | US2004036017 [ ] (ITO TAKESHI [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1-5,12-15 *; | [A]DE10118796 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [A] * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,2a-c * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003227735 A 20030815 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * abstract * |