EP1651352 - SEPARATOR COMPRISING A SPINNING DRUM WITH A DISC STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westfalia Separator GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | [2008/20] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Westfalia Separator AG Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINRICH, Holger Von-Eichendorff-Strasse 30 59320 Ennigerloh / DE | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2006/18] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 04763784.8 | 04.08.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004EP08734 | Priority number, date | DE2003136349 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10336349 | [2006/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005016543 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651352 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651352 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/08, B04B1/14 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
B04B1/08 (EP,US);
B04B11/06 (EP,US);
B04B7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEPARATOR MIT EINER SCHLEUDERTROMMEL MIT EINEM TELLERPAKET | [2006/18] | English: | SEPARATOR COMPRISING A SPINNING DRUM WITH A DISC STACK | [2006/18] | French: | SEPARATEUR POURVU D'UN PANIER CENTRIFUGE A PILE DE DISQUES | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.04.2008 | CZ | 23.04.2008 | EE | 23.04.2008 | FI | 23.04.2008 | IE | 23.04.2008 | PL | 23.04.2008 | RO | 23.04.2008 | SI | 23.04.2008 | SK | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | BG | 23.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | LU | 04.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | PT | 23.09.2008 | HU | 24.10.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
TR | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
LU | 04.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
LU | 04.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 23.04.2008 | |
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
LU | 04.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 23.04.2008 | |
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | CZ | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | FI | 23.04.2008 | |
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 23.04.2008 | |
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 23.04.2008 | |
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 23.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9625234 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) |