EP1663985 - PESTICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merial Limited 3239 Satellite Blvd Duluth, GA 30096-4640 / US | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience S.A. 55, avenue René Cassin 69009 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, David, Teh-Wei Joseph-Haydn-Strasse 18 65812 Bad Soden / DE | 02 /
KNAUF, Werner Spitzwegstrasse 6 91056 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
DÖLLER, Uwe Christian-Morgenstern-Strasse 11 63110 Rodgau / DE | 04 /
SEEGER, Karl Schwalbenweg 9 65719 Hofheim, Ts. / DE | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Clyde-Watson, Zöe, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Clyde-Watson, Zöe, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Gambert, Ulrike Bayer CropScience AG Business Planning and Administration LP-PL, Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04764358.0 | 21.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004EP09376 | Priority number, date | EP20030019619 | 04.09.2003 Original published format: EP 03019619 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023775 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663985 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663985 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/44, C07D401/04, A01N43/56 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D231/44 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/56 (KR);
A01N43/90 (KR);
A61K31/415 (KR);
A61P33/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PESTIZIDE | [2006/23] | English: | PESTICIDES | [2006/23] | French: | PESTICIDES | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.03.2009 | 20.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Request for further processing for: | 21.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.2009 | BE | 07.10.2009 | CY | 07.10.2009 | CZ | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | EE | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | NL | 07.10.2009 | PL | 07.10.2009 | RO | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | SI | 07.10.2009 | SK | 07.10.2009 | TR | 07.10.2009 | BG | 07.01.2010 | GR | 08.01.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | HU | 08.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/11] | SI | 07.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5629335 (MANNING DAVID T [US], et al) [AD] 1-9* examples 2,3,9,13,14,16,20-23,25,27-31,34; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO0035884 (AVENTIS CROPSCIENCES S A [FR]) [Y] 1-9 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US6350771 (WU TAI-TEH [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * examples 35,57,126,131,136,140,145,156,162,167,173,179; claim 1 * |