EP1660786 - MULTIPLE CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renold GmbH Juliusmühle 37574 Einbeck / DE | [2007/30] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Arnold & Stolzenberg GmbH Ortsteil Juliusmühle 37557 Einbeck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CENAC, Christophe Lönsweg 3 37574 Einbeck / DE | 02 /
RAGNITZ, Detlef Am Pfarrgarten 60 37586 Dassel / DE | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04764648.4 | 26.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004EP09682 | Priority number, date | DE2003213779U | 01.09.2003 Original published format: DE 20313779 U | [2006/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005024269 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1660786 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1660786 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/06 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
F16G13/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRFACHKETTE | [2006/22] | English: | MULTIPLE CHAIN | [2006/22] | French: | CHAINE MULTIPLE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 15.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | EE | 28.02.2007 | FI | 28.02.2007 | IE | 28.02.2007 | NL | 28.02.2007 | RO | 28.02.2007 | SI | 28.02.2007 | SK | 28.02.2007 | TR | 28.02.2007 | BG | 28.05.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | SE | 31.05.2007 | ES | 08.06.2007 | PT | 30.07.2007 | AT | 26.08.2007 | LU | 26.08.2007 | BE | 31.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | HU | 01.09.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 28.02.2007 | |
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
AT | 26.08.2007 | ||
LU | 26.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
HU | 01.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 28.02.2007 | |
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
AT | 26.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
AT | 26.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/50] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
AT | 26.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | FI | 28.02.2007 | |
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1030122 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 8 * figures 3-5 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 41 *; | [A]FR1267585 (CHAIN BELT CO) [A] 9,10,15,16 * figure 1 ** page 2, line 48 - line 81 *; | [A]EP0974770 (MORSE TEC EUROP SPA [IT]) [A] 1,10-14 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 5 - line 56 *; | [A]DE20007115U (ARNOLD & STOLZENBERG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 13 - line 20 * |