EP1561187 - IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SimonsVoss Technologies AG Feringastrasse 4 85774 Unterföhring / DE | [2005/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARHOFER, Stefan Tegernseer Landstr. 97 81539 München / DE | 02 /
MEYERLE, Herbert Göttlerstr. 10 82216 Maisach / DE | 03 /
DIETEL, Bernd Weissenhaid 6 95163 Weissenstadt / DE | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04764971.0 | 08.09.2004 | [2005/32] | WO2004EP10030 | Priority number, date | DE2003141370 | 08.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10341370 | [2005/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005027055 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561187 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
G07C9/26 (EP,US);
G07C9/257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IDENTIFIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2005/32] | English: | IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM | [2005/32] | French: | SYSTEME D'IDENTIFICATION | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 22.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.05.2010 | 22.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/31] | 01.04.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 06.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0791899 (HARRIS CORP [US]) [X] 1-33 * column 1, lines 1-57; figures 22,26; claim 11 * * column 10, line 28 - column 11, line 12 * * column 14, lines 26-32 *; | [Y]DE10109760 (UNIPEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-33 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0021] - [0023]; figure 1 *; | [Y]FR2805065 (STELLA [FR]) [Y] 1-33 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0933733 (CITICORP DEV CENTER INC [US]) [A] 1-33 * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0014] *; | [A]WO9314571 (SUPRA PROD INC [US]) [A] 1-33 * page 6, lines 7-32; figure 2 *; | [A]WO02071238 (MOOLA INC E [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * page 18; figure 2 * | Examination | EP0924656 | DE19614215 | EP1002915 | DE19851308 | - JOURNAL ARTICLE, "Hotel Sicherheit, advertisement SIMONS VOSS TECHNOLOGIES", EURO SECURITY SPEZIAL II/04, EURO SECURITY FACHVERLAGE, DE, (20040601), pages 1 - 2, XP007902782 | - INTERNET CITATION, "Biometrietransponder Q3007", NEUE VERPACKUNG, (20040419), page 1, URL: http://www.neue-verpackung.de/product/dde9842aa22.html, (20070810), XP007902777 | - INTERNET CITATION, "Weltweit erste komplett batteriebetriebene Biometrieanwendung", (20031118), page 2, URL: http://www.ess-sh.ch/ger/news.htm, (20070810), XP007902776 |