EP1663751 - RETRACTABLE STEP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, DK, GB, HU, LU, TR | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knorr-Bremse Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Beethovengasse 43-45 2340 Mödling / AT | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRTENLEHNER, Andreas Weyrerstrasse 16/1/20 A-3340 Waidhofen an der Ybbs / AT | [2006/38] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
HIRTENLEHNER, Andreas Arzbergstrasse 1a A-3340 Waidhofen an der Ybbs / AT | Representative(s) | Wiedemann, Markus Patentanwalt Ludwigstrasse 1 86150 Augsburg / DE | [2011/37] |
Former [2006/23] | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse AG, Patentabteilung - V/RG, Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04765323.3 | 17.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004EP10426 | Priority number, date | AT20030001474 | 18.09.2003 Original published format: AT 14742003 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005030551 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663751 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663751 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B61D23/02, B60R3/02 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B61D23/02 (EP,US);
B60R3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIEBETRITT | [2006/23] | English: | RETRACTABLE STEP | [2006/23] | French: | MARCHE COULISSANTE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Gebr. Bode GmbH & Co. KG Ochshäuser Strasse 14 34123 Kassel / DE Opponent's representative Bauer, Wulf, et al, et al Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Gebr. Bode GmbH & Co. KG Ochshäuser Strasse 14 34123 Kassel / DE Opponent's representative Bauer, Wulf, et al, et al Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | 15.07.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.07.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2013 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2013/23] | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.01.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | IE | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | PL | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | LU | 17.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GB | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | PT | 10.01.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | FI | 08.09.2010 | |
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0217265 (ALSTHOM [FR]) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 29 - page 3, line 18; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19503079 (GOERLITZ WAGGONBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, lines 54-63 * * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1034765 (BODE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0008] , [0011] , [0020] , [0021] , [0028] - [0033]; figures 3,4,10 * |