EP1664193 - WOOD-PLASTIC COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. Tiroler Strasse 16 3105 Unterradlberg / AT | [2007/16] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. Tiroler Strasse 15 3105 Unterradlberg / AT | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Fritz Egger GmbH & Co Tiroler Strasse 15 3105 Unterradlberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINWENDER, Martin Engelbert-Bär Strasse 2/2 A-2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT | 02 /
SCHUBERT, Peter Josef Etrich-Gasse 6 A-3100 St. Pölten / AT | 03 /
MUNDIGLER, Norbert Egon Schiele-Gasse 20 A-3430 Tulln / AT | 04 /
FRECH, Hannes Thalheim 52 A-3141 Kapelln / AT | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Rox, Thomas Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Rox, Thomas COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Rox, Thomas COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04765728.3 | 01.10.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004EP10952 | Priority number, date | DE20031046120 | 01.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10346120 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005033204 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664193 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664193 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1664193 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/00, C08L67/02, C08J5/06, C08J5/10, C08K7/02 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (EP,US);
E04F13/18 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/26 (EP,US);
C08L97/02, C08L2666/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | 27.09.2005 | HR | 01.03.2006 | LT | 27.09.2005 | LV | 27.09.2005 | MK | 27.09.2005 | Title | German: | HOLZ-KUNSTSTOFF-COMPOUND | [2006/23] | English: | WOOD-PLASTIC COMPOUND | [2006/23] | French: | COMPOSITE BOIS-PLASTIQUE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 22.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta MSD 08 / MT Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta MSD 08 / MT Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER GbR, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | 02.01.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.07.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.07.2008 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 10.09.2008 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 26.11.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.09.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.02.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | LU | 01.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/41] |
Former [2009/35] | CY | 21.02.2007 | |
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | GR | 22.05.2007 | |
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | GR | 22.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001088103 ; | [X]JPH09254106 ; | [X]JPH0569416 ; | [X]JPH04348903 ; | [X]DE2324263 (DZIUK GUENTER) [X] 1-29 * page 2, line 19 - page 5, line 3 ** abstract *; | [X]DE3923555 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-29 * column 1, line 47 - column 4, line 36 * * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001088103 A 20010403 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO LTD; DAIKEN TRADE & IND CO LTD) [X] 1-29 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09254106 A 19970930 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO LTD; DAIKEN TRADE & IND CO LTD) [X] 1-29 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930720), vol. 017, no. 385, Database accession no. (M - 1448), & JP05069416 A 19930323 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-29 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930422), vol. 017, no. 206, Database accession no. (M - 1400), & JP04348903 A 19921203 (DAIKEN TRADE & IND CO LTD) [X] 1-29 * abstract * | Opposition | EP0122944 | EP0985519 | DE69604843T | US6207729 | JP2001172486 | EP0667375 | EP0869988 | EP1250995 | DE20213530U | - "Kapitel 7", Handbuch der Kunststoff-Extrusionstechnik II-Extrusionsanlagen, HANSER-VERLAG, (1986), pages 187 - 197 | - WALTER MINK, Grundzüge der Extrudertechik, SPEYER AM RHEIN, ZECHNER & HUETHIG VERLAG GMBH, (1973), pages 281 - 287 |