EP1682462 - REDISPERSIBLE DISPERSION POWDERS FOR HEAT INSULATING COMPOSITE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elotex AG Industriestrasse 17a 6203 Sempach Station / CH | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Heinz-Peter Gross-Gerauer-Strasse 79 55130 Mainz / DE | 02 /
SCHOTTLER, Michael Gartenstrasse 3 65474 Bischofsheim / DE | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Ackermann, Joachim Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Ackermann Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Ackermann, Joachim Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 04765785.3 | 04.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004EP11044 | Priority number, date | DE2003151334 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10351334 | [2006/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005047204 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682462 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1682462 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/26, C04B28/00 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
C04B24/26 (EP,US);
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B40/0042 (EP,US);
C04B2103/0057 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00534 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00637 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/06, C04B14/28 (US,EP);
C04B40/0042, C04B24/26, C04B24/383 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REDISPERGIERBARE DISPERSIONSPULVER FÜR WÄRMEDÄMM-VERBUNDSYSTEME | [2006/30] | English: | REDISPERSIBLE DISPERSION POWDERS FOR HEAT INSULATING COMPOSITE SYSTEM | [2006/30] | French: | POUDRE DE DISPERSION REDISPERSIBLE DESTINEE A DES SYSTEMES COMPOSITES CALORIFUGES | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 13.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.07.2008 | CZ | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | IE | 16.07.2008 | IT | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | PL | 16.07.2008 | RO | 16.07.2008 | SI | 16.07.2008 | SK | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | AT | 04.10.2008 | LU | 04.10.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | GB | 16.10.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | ES | 27.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | FR | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | HU | 17.01.2009 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
TR | 16.07.2008 | ||
AT | 04.10.2008 | ||
LU | 04.10.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
HU | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
AT | 04.10.2008 | ||
LU | 04.10.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
HU | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
AT | 04.10.2008 | ||
LU | 04.10.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
AT | 04.10.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
AT | 04.10.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/51] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 16.07.2008 | |
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1238958 (WACKER POLYMER SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-11 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0029] - [0031] - [0034]; example -; claims 1,12,13 *; | [X]EP1262465 (WACKER POLYMER SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-11* paragraphs [0010] - [0016] - [0039]; claims 1,8-10 * | by applicant | EP0894822 | EP1148038 |