EP1677776 - EXTENDED RELEASE TABLET FORMULATIONS OF VENLAFAXINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROWLEY, Michael 187 Segensworth Road Titchfield, Fareham PO15 5EH / GB | 02 /
POTTS, Angela Allind Brownwich Lane Titchfield, Hampshire PO14 4NT / GB | 03 /
SIMS, Edward Friar Wood, Martin Street, Bishops Waltham Southampton, Hampshire SO32 1DN / GB | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Wileman, David Francis, et al Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Patent Department, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow, Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | [2006/28] | Application number, filing date | 04765928.9 | 12.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004EP11384 | Priority number, date | EP20030256439 | 13.10.2003 Original published format: EP 03256439 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005039555 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1677776 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1677776 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61K9/22 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K9/2013 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | 08.05.2006 | HR | 08.05.2006 | LT | 08.05.2006 | LV | 08.05.2006 | MK | 08.05.2006 | Title | German: | TABLETTENFORMULIERUNGEN VON VENLAFAXIN MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG | [2006/28] | English: | EXTENDED RELEASE TABLET FORMULATIONS OF VENLAFAXINE | [2006/28] | French: | PREPARATIONS A LIBERATION PROLONGEE DE LA VENLAFAXINE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 10.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2008 | BE | 24.09.2008 | CY | 24.09.2008 | CZ | 24.09.2008 | EE | 24.09.2008 | PL | 24.09.2008 | RO | 24.09.2008 | SI | 24.09.2008 | SK | 24.09.2008 | TR | 24.09.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | BG | 24.12.2008 | SE | 24.12.2008 | GR | 25.12.2008 | PT | 24.02.2009 | HU | 25.03.2009 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CY | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
TR | 24.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
HU | 25.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CY | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
HU | 25.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
SI | 24.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0797991 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [AD] 1-23 * page 2, line 39 - line 41 ** example 1 *; | [Y]WO03017984 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 18,19 * example 3 *; | [XY]WO03082805 (SYNTHON BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-9,11-17,21,22 * page 14, line 12 - line 15 * * page 18, line 24 - line 26 * * example 3 * [Y] 18,19 |