EP1664508 - METHOD FOR QUANTIFYING A PRE-INJECTION IN A FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM OF A COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖHNIG, Ralf Hermann-Köhl-Str. 6a 93049 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
HIRN, Rainer Strassackerweg 52 93073 Neutraubing / DE | 03 /
SCHLEGL, Thomas Metzgerweg 32 93055 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
ZIMMER, Christian Burgunder Str. 15 93053 Regensburg / DE | [2006/23] | Application number, filing date | 04766442.0 | 06.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004EP51738 | Priority number, date | DE2003143069 | 17.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10343069 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031137 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664508 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664508 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F02D35/02, F02D41/40, F02M65/00, F02P17/12, F02P5/152 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
F02D35/027 (EP);
F02D41/403 (EP);
F02M45/04 (EP);
F02M65/00 (EP);
F02P17/12 (EP);
F02P5/152 (EP);
F02D2041/389 (EP);
F02D2200/025 (EP);
F02D2200/0602 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/52] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG EINER VOREINSPRITZUNG BEI EINEM KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZSYSTEM EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE SOWIE VORRICHTUNG | [2006/23] | English: | METHOD FOR QUANTIFYING A PRE-INJECTION IN A FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM OF A COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND DEVICE | [2006/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE QUANTIFICATION D'UNE PREINJECTION DANS LE SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 15.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.04.2008 | GB | 06.08.2008 | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/41] | IT | 23.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5739417 (GROB FERDINAND [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,9 * figures 2,4-6 * * column 2, line 16 - line 30 * * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 14 *; | [A]DE19612179 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0937883 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0013] * * paragraphs [0050] , [0053] - [0061] * * figures 1,9-11 *; | [A]JPS63147956 ; | [A]US4704999 (HASHIKAWA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,9 * figures 1,5 * * column 4, line 4 - line 63 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881026), vol. 0124, no. 04, Database accession no. (M - 757), & JP63147956 A 19880620 (NIPPON DENSO CO LTD; others: 01) [A] 1,3,9 * abstract * |